Granger v. Spallding

Plaintiff: Kevin E. Granger
Defendant: Ms. Spallding
Case Number: 6:2019cv06210
Filed: March 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Charles J Siragusa
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. Consent form, privacy notice and timeline mailed to plaintiff. (TF)
March 21, 2019 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:19-cv-02203.
March 14, 2019 Mailed a copy of #3 Order, to Kevin E. Granger DIN No. 09-B-2583 Mid-State Correctional Facility P.O. Box 2500 Marcy, NY 13403. (vba) [Transferred from nysd on 3/21/2019.]
March 13, 2019 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Western District of New York. (rjm) [Transferred from nysd on 3/21/2019.]
March 13, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (sac) [Transferred from nysd on 3/21/2019.]
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TRANSFER ORDER: Plaintiff's claims arose in Corning, New York, in Steuben County, which is located in the Western District of New York. See 28 U.S.C. 112(d). Accordingly, venue lies in the Western District of New York, 28 U.S.C. 1391(b)(2), and this action is transferred to the United States District Court for the Western District of New York, 28 U.S.C. 1406(a). The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket, mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, and note service on the docket. The Clerk of Court is further directed to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Western District of New York. Whether Plaintiff should be permitted to proceed further without prepayment of fees is a determination to be made by the transferee court. A summons shall not issue from this Court. This order closes this case. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 3/13/2019) (sac) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing. [Transferred from nysd on 3/21/2019.]
March 8, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sac) [Transferred from nysd on 3/21/2019.]
March 8, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Spallding. Document filed by Kevin E. Granger. (sac) [Transferred from nysd on 3/21/2019.]
March 8, 2019 Filing 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Kevin E. Granger.(sac) [Transferred from nysd on 3/21/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Granger v. Spallding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Spallding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin E. Granger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?