Regis-Dumeus -v- Great Lakes Kraut Company LLC
Plaintiff: MRS JOCELYNE REGIS DUMEUS, ESTATE OF JONATHAN MICHEL DUMEUS, Paul Exantus and Jocelyne Regis-Dumeus
Defendant: GLK FOODS LLC, GREAT LAKES KRAUT COMPANY LLC and GLK LLC
Case Number: 6:2019cv06352
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Michael A. Telesca
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2019 E-Filing Notification: Please note for future reference that the proper event is summons returned executed. No action required #3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for affidavit (TF)
May 31, 2019 RE #3 - SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jocelyne Regis-Dumeus, Paul Exantus. Great Lakes Kraut Company LLC served on 5/14/2019, answer due 6/4/2019; GLK LLC served on 5/14/2019, answer due 6/4/2019; GLK FOODS LLC served on 5/14/2019, answer due 6/4/2019. (TF)
May 31, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for affidavit served on GLKFOODS on MAY 14, 2019, filed by Paul Exantus. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit)(Koloko, Annick Tchokonte)
May 15, 2019 E-Filing Notification: #2 Summons Issued as to Great Lakes Kraut Company LLC. Modified on 5/15/2019. Missing summonses for GLK FOODS LLC, GLK LLC. Action required: file additional summonses using continuation of exhibits event. (TF)
May 15, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Great Lakes Kraut Company LLC. Modified on 5/15/2019 (TF).
May 14, 2019 E-Filing Notification: #1 COMPLAINT, when adding parties do not use all caps and enter names as they appear on the complaint including any party text. Clerk to modify names and docket. No action required. (TF)
May 14, 2019 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution(TF)
May 14, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (TF)
May 14, 2019 Case assigned to Hon. Michael A. Telesca. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil opening. (TF)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GREAT LAKES KRAUT COMPANY LLC, GLK FOODS LLC, GLK LLC $ 400 receipt number 0209-3449923, filed by JOCELYNE REGIS DUMEUS, ESTATE OF JONATHAN MICHEL DUMEUS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement SUMMONS PLAINTIFF #1, #3 Supplement SUMMONS PLAINTIFF #2)(Koloko, Annick Tchokonte)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Regis-Dumeus -v- Great Lakes Kraut Company LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MRS JOCELYNE REGIS DUMEUS
Represented By: Annick Tchokonte Kamga Koloko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESTATE OF JONATHAN MICHEL DUMEUS
Represented By: Annick Tchokonte Kamga Koloko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Exantus
Represented By: Annick Tchokonte Kamga Koloko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jocelyne Regis-Dumeus
Represented By: Annick Tchokonte Kamga Koloko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLK FOODS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREAT LAKES KRAUT COMPANY LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLK LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?