DeJesus v. Wyoming Correctional Facility et al
Plaintiff: Luis (Louis) DeJesus
Defendant: Akinyemi Awopetu, Wyoming Correctional Facility, C. Kruse and Thomas Sticht
Case Number: 6:2019cv06355
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth A Wolford
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2019 Filing 9 Case transferred in from District of New York Northern; Case Number 9:19-cv-00396.
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 DECISION AND ORDER: ORDERED that the Clerk of this Court transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Western District of New York. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 5/13/19. {order served via regular mail on plaintiff}(nas) [Transferred from nynd on 5/14/2019.]
April 22, 2019 Filing 7 INMATE AUTHORIZATION FORM by Luis (Louis) DeJesus. (nas ) [Transferred from nynd on 5/14/2019.]
April 22, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Luis (Louis) DeJesus.(nas, ) [Transferred from nynd on 5/14/2019.]
April 15, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT ORDER REOPENING CASE: This action was administratively closed due to plaintiff's failure to comply with the filing fee requirements, and plaintiff was directed to respond to the Order if s/he wished to pursue this action. Plaintiff has now responded. The Clerk is directed to reopen this action and restore it to the Court's active docket. Authorized by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 4/15/19. {text order served via regular mail on plaintiff}(nas) [Transferred from nynd on 5/14/2019.]
April 15, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Luis (Louis) DeJesus. (nas, ) [Transferred from nynd on 5/14/2019.]
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Directing Administrative Closure with Opportunity to Comply with Filing Fee Requirement. ORDERED that plaintiff's IFP Application is DENIED as incomplete. ORDERED that because this action was not properly commenced, the Clerk is directed to administratively close this action. ORDERED that if plaintiff desires to pursue this action, he must so notify the Court WITHIN THIRTY (30) DAYS of the filing date of this Order and either (1) pay the full $400.00 filing fee for civil actions or (2) submit a completed and signed IFP Application that has been certified by an appropriate official at his facility and a signed Inmate Authorization Form. ORDERED that upon plaintiff's compliance herewith, the Clerk shall reopen this action and forward it to the Court for review. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 4/3/2019. (Order, blank IFP application and Inmate Authorization form mailed to plaintiff by regular mail). (rar) [Transferred from nynd on 5/14/2019.]
April 3, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Luis (Louis) DeJesus. (rar, ) [Transferred from nynd on 5/14/2019.]
April 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Akinyemi Awopetu, C. Kruse, Thomas Sticht, and Wyoming Correctional Facility filed by Luis (Louis) DeJesus. (Attachments: #1 envelope) (rar, ) Modified to show Wyoming Correctional Facility as a defendant on 4/4/2019 (rar, ). [Transferred from nynd on 5/14/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DeJesus v. Wyoming Correctional Facility et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis (Louis) DeJesus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Akinyemi Awopetu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyoming Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Kruse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Sticht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?