Ballam v. United States of America

Plaintiff: Sherri A. Ballam
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 6:2019cv06360
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Frank P Geraci
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2674
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Verified Complaint served on William P. Barr, Esq., United States Attorney General on May 20, 2019, filed by Sherri A. Ballam. (Towey, Brian)
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint w/ Exhibit A, and Certificate of Merit served on United States of America c/o US Attorney James P. Kennedy, Jr., Esq. on 5/17/2019, filed by Sherri A. Ballam. (Towey, Brian)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(TF)
May 16, 2019 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution(TF)
May 16, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (TF)
May 16, 2019 Case assigned to Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr.. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil opening. (TF)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Sherri A. Ballam, Administrator of the Estate of Brian A. Ballam against All Defendants $ 400 receipt number 0209-3452650, filed by Sherri A. Ballam. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Exhibit Exhibit A - SF-95, #5 Certificate of Merit)(Towey, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ballam v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherri A. Ballam
Represented By: Brian Kevin Towey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?