Gamet v. Carver
Plaintiff: Amy Gamet
Defendant: Rhonda Lee Carver
Case Number: 6:2019cv06363
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: David G Larimer
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Rhonda Lee Carver. (LB)
June 14, 2019 Filing 7 Original Summons Filed. (Reuber, Cameron)
May 15, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright (reflecting new case number) has been mailed to the Copyright Office. (Attachments: #1 copy of complaint) (KLH) (Main Document 6 replaced on 5/15/2019) (KLH).
May 15, 2019 Notification to chambers of on-line civil opening. (KLH)
May 15, 2019 Remark: All future submissions in this action should reflect, and be filed in, the new (Rochester) case number 19-cv-6363. (KLH)
May 15, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT ORDER transferring this case to the Rochester Division, due to a clerical error at case opening. Signed by Mary C. Loewenguth, Clerk of Court on 5/15/2019. (KLH)
May 14, 2019 Filing 4 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS to #1 Complaint, #2 Continuation of Exhibits . (Reuber, Cameron)
May 10, 2019 Filing 3 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a copyright mailed to the Copyright Office. (Attachments: #1 complaint) (KM)
May 10, 2019 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution(KM)
May 10, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (KM)
May 10, 2019 Case assigned to Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. Notification to chambers of on-line civil opening. (KM)
May 10, 2019 E-Filing Notification: #2 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS. Filer should refile the civil cover sheet and include the county of the parties. (KM)
May 8, 2019 Filing 2 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS by Amy Gamet. to #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet filed by Amy Gamet. (Reuber, Cameron)
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Rhonda Lee Carver $ 400 receipt number 0209-3444391, filed by Amy Gamet. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Reuber, Cameron)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gamet v. Carver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhonda Lee Carver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Gamet
Represented By: Cameron Sean Reuber
Represented By: Lauren B. Emerson
Represented By: Lauren Beth Emerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?