Dawson v. Doe et al

Plaintiff: Lavon Dawson
Defendant: John/Jane Doe
Case Number: 6:2019cv06371
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Charles J Siragusa
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 13 Letter from Lavon Dawson, dated 6/24/19, to Clerk (TF)
June 26, 2019 Filing 12 Letter from Lavon Dawson, dated 6/19/19, to Clerk (TF)
May 20, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. Pro se packet including consent form, privacy notice and timeline mailed to plaintiff (TF)
May 20, 2019 Filing 11 Case transferred in from District of New York Northern; Case Number 9:19-cv-00258.
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 DECISION AND ORDER: ORDERED that this action be transferred to the United States District Court for the Western District of New York. Signed by Magistrate Judge David E. Peebles on 5/15/19. {order served via regular mail on plaintiff}(nas) [Transferred from nynd on 5/20/2019.]
April 18, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Lavon Dawson. (sal ) [Transferred from nynd on 5/20/2019.]
April 5, 2019 Filing 8 Letter inquiring into status of case filed by Lavon Dawson. (Updated docket sheet mailed to plaintiff). (sal ) [Transferred from nynd on 5/20/2019.]
April 3, 2019 Filing 7 DECISION AND ORDER that plaintiff must, within thirty (30) days of the filing date of this Decision and Order, (1) pay the $400.00 filing fee in full; or (2) submit a completed, signed, and certified IFP application; or (3) submit a completed and signed IFP application along with certified copies of his inmate account for the six-month period immediately preceding the filing of his complaint, and it is further ORDERED that, in the event plaintiff fails to timely comply with the filing fee requirements set forth in this Decision and Order, this action will be dismissed without prejudice without further Order of this Court and the Clerk shall close the case; and it is further ORDERED that, upon plaintiff's compliance with this Decision and Order, the file shall be returned to the Court for further review. (Notice of Compliance Deadline 5/3/2019. Case Review Deadline 6/3/2019). Signed by Senior District Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 4/3/2019. (Copy of Order and Blank IFP served upon plaintiff via regular mail). (sal ) [Transferred from nynd on 5/20/2019.]
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER REOPENING CASE: This action was administratively closed due to plaintiff's failure to comply with the filing fee requirements, and plaintiff was directed to respond to the Order if s/he wished to pursue this action. Plaintiff has now responded. The Clerk is directed to reopen this action and restore it to the Court's active docket. Authorized by Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 3/28/19. {text order served via regular mail on plaintiff}(nas, ) [Transferred from nynd on 5/20/2019.]
March 20, 2019 Filing 5 INMATE AUTHORIZATION FORM by Lavon Dawson. (nas, ) [Transferred from nynd on 5/20/2019.]
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Directing Administrative Closure with Opportunity to Comply with Filing Fee Requirement. ORDERED that plaintiff's IFP Application is DENIED as incomplete. ORDERED that because this action was not properly commenced, the Clerk is directed to administratively close this action. ORDERED that if plaintiff desires to pursue this action, he must so notify the Court WITHIN THIRTY (30) DAYS of the filing date of this Order and either (1) pay the full $400.00 filing fee for civil actions or (2) submit a completed and signed IFP Application that has been certified by an appropriate official at his facility and a signed Inmate Authorization Form consenting to payment of $350.00 over time. ORDERED that upon plaintiff's compliance herewith, the Clerk shall reopen this action and forward it to the Court for review. Signed by Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 2/25/2019. (Order, blank IFP form and Inmate Authorization form mailed to plaintiff by regular mail). (rar, ) [Transferred from nynd on 5/20/2019.]
February 22, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Lavon Dawson. (rar) [Transferred from nynd on 5/20/2019.]
February 22, 2019 Filing 2 INMATE AUTHORIZATION FORM by Lavon Dawson. (rar) [Transferred from nynd on 5/20/2019.]
February 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John/Jane Doe, John/Jane Doe filed by Lavon Dawson. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope) (rar) Modified on 2/25/2019 (rar, ). [Transferred from nynd on 5/20/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dawson v. Doe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lavon Dawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John/Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?