Khalili v. Barr et al
Petitioner: Behzad Khalili
Respondent: Jeffery Searls, Thomas Feeley and William P. Barr
Case Number: 6:2019cv06373
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth A Wolford
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion for an Extension of Time to File. Respondents' deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the Petition is extended to August 12, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 07/01/2019. (PFC) (A copy of this Text Order was mailed to Petitioner).
July 1, 2019 E-Filing Notification: Incorrect relief used to electronically file document. For future reference, use Motion for an extension of time event/relief. No action required RE #3 MOTION re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Clerk to modify text. (TF)
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #2 Order,, NOTICE OF MOTION by William P. Barr, Thomas Feeley, Jeffery Searls.(Moar, Daniel) Modified on 7/1/2019 (TF).
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER that within 45 days of the date of this Order, Respondents shall file and serve an answer and memo of law responding to the allegations in the Petition.Petitioner shall have 25 days after his receipt of Respondents' answer or motion to dismiss to file a written response. The Clerk of Court shall serve a copy of the Petition, together with a copy of this Order, electronically via a Notice of Electronic Filing to the United States Attorney's Office, Western District of New York. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 5/28/19. (Attachments: #1 Petition)(mailed a copy of this order to the petitioner) (TF)
May 20, 2019 Prisoner Pro Se Packet consisting of Privacy Notice, Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge and Civil Case Timeline mailed to petitioner. (JHF)
May 20, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. Pro se packet including consent form, timeline and privacy notice mailed to petitioner. (TF)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Behzad Khalili. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-8, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope) Filing fee paid: #ROC011435 $5.00(TF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Khalili v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jeffery Searls
Represented By: United States Attorney's Office (e-service)
Represented By: Daniel Barrie Moar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Thomas Feeley
Represented By: United States Attorney's Office (e-service)
Represented By: Daniel Barrie Moar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William P. Barr
Represented By: United States Attorney's Office (e-service)
Represented By: Daniel Barrie Moar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Behzad Khalili
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?