Doyle v. Speedway LLC
Plaintiff: Susan Doyle
Defendant: Speedway LLC
Case Number: 6:2019cv06383
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jonathan W Feldman
Referring Judge: Charles J Siragusa
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Filing 7 Letter filed by Speedway LLC as to Speedway LLC requesting permission to appear telephonically for Rule 16 Conference. (Hannah, Brittany)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 8/7/2019 at 12:00 PM before Hon. Jonathan W. Feldman. A joint proposed discovery plan is due to be filed with the Court at least 4 business days in advance of the conference. Signed by Hon. Jonathan W. Feldman on 7/9/2019. (SR)
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Hon. Jonathan W. Feldman. The Magistrate Judge is hereby designated to act in this case as follows: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), all pre-trial matters in this case are referred to the above-named United States Magistrate Judge, including but not limited to: (1) conduct of a scheduling conference and entry of a scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, (2) hearing and disposition of all non-dispositive motions or applications, (3) supervision of discovery, and (4) supervision of all procedural matters involving the aforementioned or involving the preparation of the case or any matter therein for consideration by the District Judge. All non-dispositive motions or applications shall be filed with the Clerk and made returnable before the Magistrate Judge. The parties are encouraged to consider the provisions of 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) governing consent to either partial or complete disposition of the case, including trial if necessary, by the Magistrate Judge. Consent forms are available from the office of the Magistrate Judge or the office of the Clerk of Court. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Charles J. Siragusa on 7/8/19. (KJA)
May 23, 2019 Filing 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Speedway LLC. (Hannah, Brittany)
May 23, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Notice of Removal served on Thomas J. Rzepka, Esq. on 05/23/2019, filed by Speedway LLC. (Hannah, Brittany)
May 23, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Speedway LLC identifying Corporate Parent Marathon Petroleum Corporation for Speedway LLC.. (Hannah, Brittany)
May 23, 2019 E-Filing Notification: Incorrect event used to electronically file document re Disclosure statement. Action required, e-file using event Corporate Disclosure Statement. RE: #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Speedway LLC Exhibit, # 11 Disclosure Statement. (TF)
May 23, 2019 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution(TF)
May 23, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (TF)
May 23, 2019 Case assigned to Hon. Charles J. Siragusa. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil opening. (TF)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Speedway LLC from Wayne, case number 81895. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0209-3460640), filed by Speedway LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Affidavit, #12 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hannah, Brittany)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doyle v. Speedway LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Speedway LLC
Represented By: Brittany L. Hannah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Doyle
Represented By: Thomas J. Rzepka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?