Smithgall v. Roberts Wesleyan College
Plaintiff: Barbara Smithgall
Defendant: Roberts Wesleyan College
Case Number: 6:2019cv06416
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Michael A. Telesca
Referring Judge: Jonathan W Feldman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 8/14/2019 09:30 AM before Hon. Jonathan W. Feldman. The parties must file a proposed discovery plan at least four business days before the scheduling conference. Signed by Hon. Jonathan W. Feldman on 7/16/19. (BJJ)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Hon. Jonathan W. Feldman. Signed by Hon. Michael A. Telesca on 7/15/19. (JMC)
July 12, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Roberts Wesleyan College. (Dechert, Heather)
July 11, 2019 ADR Plan electronically forwarded to attorneys. The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution. (JHF)
July 11, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Roberts Wesleyan College.(Dechert, Heather)
June 20, 2019 Answer due date updated as to Roberts Wesleyan College answer due 7/12/2019. (JHF)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting defendant's request for an extension of the deadline for answering or otherwise repsonding to the complaint until July 12, 2019.. Signed by Hon. Michael A. Telesca on 6/20/2019. (JMC)
June 20, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather Dechert on behalf of Roberts Wesleyan College (Dechert, Heather)
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Barbara Smithgall. Roberts Wesleyan College served on 6/7/2019, answer due 6/28/2019. (Hartt, James)
June 6, 2019 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation. The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution. (JHF)
June 6, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (JHF)
June 6, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Roberts Wesleyan College. (JHF)
June 6, 2019 Case assigned to Hon. Michael A. Telesca. Notification to chambers of on-line civil case opening. (JHF)
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Roberts Wesleyan College ($400 receipt number 0209-3475502), filed by Barbara Smithgall. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A- NYSDHR Determination, #3 Exhibit B- EEOC Right To Sue, #4 Proposed Summons) (Hartt, James) Modified on 6/6/2019 (JHF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smithgall v. Roberts Wesleyan College
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Smithgall
Represented By: James D. Hartt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roberts Wesleyan College
Represented By: Heather Dechert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?