Fowler-Posman v. NYSARC, Inc.
Plaintiff: Linda Fowler-Posman
Defendant: NYSARC, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv06447
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Michael A. Telesca
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Filing 9 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by NYSARC, Inc..(Morris, Daniel)
August 14, 2019 E-Filing Notification: RE #8 Letter filed by NYSARC, Inc. as to NYSARC, Inc. . (Morris, Daniel). This document contains a request for relief and should be filed as a motion. ACTION REQUIRED: Re-file document using the motion event. (BK)
August 13, 2019 Filing 8 Letter filed by NYSARC, Inc. as to NYSARC, Inc. . (Morris, Daniel)
August 13, 2019 ATTENTION CORPORATION PLAINTIFFS/DEFENDANTS: All Corporate Disclosure Statements pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.7.1(b) are to be filed within seven(7) days of this notice. (MD)
August 12, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Linda Fowler-Posman. NYSARC Inc served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019. (Hartt, James) Modified on 8/12/2019 (LB).
August 2, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel William Morris on behalf of NYSARC, Inc. (Morris, Daniel)
July 24, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to NYSARC, Inc.. (BK)
July 23, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT Linda Fowler-Posman against NYSARC, Inc., filed by Linda Fowler-Posman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - EEOC Right to Sue, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Amended Civil Cover, #3 Proposed Amended Summons)(Hartt, James)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Linda Fowler-Posman. NYSARC, Inc. served on 7/5/2019, answer due 7/26/2019. (Hartt, James)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to NYSARC, Inc.. (BK)
June 21, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (BK)
June 21, 2019 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation. The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution. (BK)
June 21, 2019 Case Assigned to Hon. Michael A. Telesca. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (BK)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Linda Fowler-Posman against NYSARC, Inc. $ 400 receipt number 0209-3493719, filed by Linda Fowler-Posman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - US EEOC Right to Sue, #3 Proposed Summons)(Hartt, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fowler-Posman v. NYSARC, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Fowler-Posman
Represented By: James D. Hartt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYSARC, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel William Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?