United States of America v. Herbster et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Marlene V. Herbster, County of Monroe, XYZ Corporation, John Doe, The People of the State of New York, Midland Funding LLC, David R. Herbster and Mary Roe
Case Number: 6:2019cv06455
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth A Wolford
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Returned Unexecuted by United States of America as to John Doe, Mary Roe, XYZ Corporation. (Labletta, Nicole)
July 22, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. County of Monroe served on 7/2/2019, answer due 7/23/2019; David R. Herbster served on 7/3/2019, answer due 7/24/2019; Marlene V. Herbster served on 7/3/2019, answer due 7/24/2019; Midland Funding LLC served on 7/1/2019, answer due 7/22/2019; The People of the State of New York served on 7/1/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (Labletta, Nicole)
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Reissued as to John Doe, Mary Roe, XYZ Corporation. Corrected with correct district court listed in caption. (JHF)
June 28, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to John Doe, Mary Roe, XYZ Corporation. (JHF)
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS by United States of America to #1 Complaint, Summons filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 summons, #2 summons) (Labletta, Nicole)
June 24, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (JHF)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to County of Monroe, David R. Herbster, Marlene V. Herbster, Midland Funding LLC, The People of the State of New York. (JHF)
June 24, 2019 Case assigned to Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford. Notification to chambers of on-line civil case opening. (JHF)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by United States of America (Labletta, Nicole)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons for David Herbster, #3 Summons for Marlene Herbster, #4 Summons for Midland Funding, #5 Summons for State of New York, #6 Summons for County of Monroe)(Labletta, Nicole)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Herbster et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marlene V. Herbster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Monroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The People of the State of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Funding LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David R. Herbster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Roe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Nicole Bernadette Labletta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?