Catchpole v. Homeland Housewares, LLC et al
Plaintiff: April Catchpole
Defendant: Nutriliving, LLC, Homeland Housewares, LLC, Nutribullet, LLC, Call to Action, LLC and Capital Brands, LLC
Case Number: 6:2019cv06459
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Marian W Payson
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Wolford
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2020 Filing 13 TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Hon. Marian W. Payson for all pretrial matters excluding dispositive motions. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 2/18/2020. (BK)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Plaintiff APRIL CATCHPOLE's causes of action for (5) Breach of Implied Warranty of Merchantability and (6) Violation of Cal. Bus. & Prof. Code 17200, et seq. be dismissed and hereby are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 2/11/2020. (BK)
February 11, 2020 E-Filing Notification: Document contains so ordered line and should be submitted via e-mail to the assigned judge. Refer to the Administrative Guide for e-mail addresses. No action required #11 STIPULATION TO DISMISS CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE; AND ORDER THEREON by April Catchpole. (Lavine, Aaron) (BK)
February 10, 2020 Filing 11 STIPULATION TO DISMISS CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE; AND ORDER THEREON by April Catchpole. (Lavine, Aaron)
August 12, 2019 ATTENTION CORPORATION PLAINTIFFS/DEFENDANTS: All Corporate Disclosure Statements pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.7.1(b) are to be filed within seven(7) days of this notice. (MD)
August 9, 2019 Filing 10 TEXT ORDER re #9 Motion to Dismiss. Responses are due on or before 8/30/2019. Upon receipt of all papers, the Court will determine if oral argument is necessary and, if so, will advise the parties of the date and time. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 08/09/2019. (PFC)
August 9, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Call to Action, LLC, Capital Brands, LLC, Homeland Housewares, LLC, Nutribullet, LLC, Nutriliving, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support In Support of Defendants' Motion To Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint)(Krejci, Eric)
August 8, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric T. Krejci on behalf of All Defendants (Krejci, Eric)
August 6, 2019 Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Aaron Matthew Lavine. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 8/6/2019. (CDH)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
August 6, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT by April Catchpole. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service, #2 Proof of Service, #3 Proof of Service, #4 Proof of Service, #5 Proof of Service)(Plukas, Richard)
July 10, 2019 Confirmed admission to the California State bar for attorney Aaron Matthew Lavine. (BK)
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT Civility Principles & Guidelines by April Catchpole. (Attachments: #1 Civility Principles & Guidelines)(Plukas, Richard)
July 9, 2019 E-Filing Notification: Re #4 MOTION to appear pro hac vice ( Filing fee $150 receipt number 0209-3510873.) The motion is missing the Civility Principal Oath. Action Required: fill out and submit the required Civility Principal Oath form. (BK)
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to appear pro hac vice ( Filing fee $ 150 receipt number 0209-3510873.) by April Catchpole. (Attachments: #1 Attorney's Oath, #2 Registration Form, #3 Pro Hac Vice Order, #4 Application, #5 Sponsoring Affidavit, #6 Lavine Input Sheet)(Plukas, Richard)
June 27, 2019 Sent notification to the MDL of a potential new case. (BK)
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons) (BK)
June 27, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (BK)
June 27, 2019 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation. The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution. (BK)
June 27, 2019 Case Assigned to Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (BK)
June 26, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants $ 400 receipt number 0209-3500151, filed by April Catchpole. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Plukas, Richard)
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by April Catchpole. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (BK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Catchpole v. Homeland Housewares, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: April Catchpole
Represented By: Aaron Matthew Lavine
Represented By: Richard A. Plukas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nutriliving, LLC
Represented By: Eric T. Krejci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Homeland Housewares, LLC
Represented By: Eric T. Krejci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nutribullet, LLC
Represented By: Eric T. Krejci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Call to Action, LLC
Represented By: Eric T. Krejci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital Brands, LLC
Represented By: Eric T. Krejci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?