Sellars vs. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Brent Sellars
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 6:2019cv06460
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jean Marie Del Colliano on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Del Colliano, Jean Marie)
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Court finds that plaintiff meets the statutory requirements for in forma pauperis status and therefore his motion (Docket # 2) is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to file plaintiffs papers without payment of fees. The service of the complaint has been performed in accordance with WDNY Local Rule 5.5. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 7/17/19. (NNR)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service served on Social Security Administration, US Attorney's Office and US Attorney General on 7/17/19, filed by Brent Sellars. (Phillips, Gregory)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Attached issued summons and complaint served electronically on the defendant pursuant to Western District of New Yorks Local Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 complaint)(TF)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Brent Sellars.(Phillips, Gregory)
June 25, 2019 E-Filing Notification: #1 COMPLAINT - you must pay a filing fee by personal check, money order, certified check, or official check made out to "Clerk, United States District Court". The fee schedule can be located on our public web site or provided to you by a member of the Clerks Office. You may also file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis (as a poor person); if you qualify, you will not be required to pay the filing fee. (TF)
June 25, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (TF)
June 25, 2019 Case placed in Social Security Assignment Pool (TF)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Brent Sellars, filed by Brent Sellars. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Phillips, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sellars vs. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brent Sellars
Represented By: Gregory T. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Jean Marie Del Colliano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?