Lamar Advertising of Penn, LLC et al v. Town of Canandaigua et al
Plaintiff: Joan Purdy, Canandaigua National Bank and Trust Company and Lamar Advertising of Penn, LLC
Defendant: Town Board of the Town of Canandaigua, Town of Canandaigua and Chris Jensen
Case Number: 6:2019cv06487
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jonathan W Feldman
Referring Judge: Charles J Siragusa
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 9/4/2019 at 12:00 PM before Hon. Jonathan W. Feldman. A joint proposed discovery plan is due to be filed with the Court at least 4 business days in advance of the conference. Signed by Hon. Jonathan W. Feldman on 8/1/19. (SR)
July 31, 2019 Filing 11 TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Hon. Jonathan W. Feldman.The Magistrate Judge is hereby designated to act in this case as follows: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), all pre-trial matters in this case are referred to the above-named United States Magistrate Judge, including but not limited to: (1) conduct of a scheduling conference and entry of a scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, (2) hearing and disposition of all non-dispositive motions or applications, (3) supervision of discovery, and (4) supervision of all procedural matters involving the aforementioned or involving the preparation of the case or any matter therein for consideration by the District Judge. All non-dispositive motions or applications shall be filed with the Clerk and made returnable before the Magistrate Judge. The parties are encouraged to consider the provisions of 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) governing consent to either partial or complete disposition of the case, including trial if necessary, by the Magistrate Judge. Consent forms are available from the office of the Magistrate Judge or the office of the Clerk of Court. IT IS SO ORDERED Signed by Hon. Charles J. Siragusa on 7/31/19. (KJA)
July 30, 2019 Filing 10 Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Chris Jensen, Town Board of the Town of Canandaigua, Town of Canandaigua.(Schwab, Andrew)
July 25, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew J. Schwab on behalf of All Defendants (Schwab, Andrew)
July 10, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joan Purdy, Lamar Advertising of Penn, LLC, Canandaigua National Bank and Trust Company. Chris Jensen served on 7/9/2019, answer due 7/30/2019. (Nonkes, Steven)
July 10, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joan Purdy, Lamar Advertising of Penn, LLC, Canandaigua National Bank and Trust Company. Town Board of the Town of Canandaigua served on 7/9/2019, answer due 7/30/2019. (Nonkes, Steven)
July 10, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joan Purdy, Lamar Advertising of Penn, LLC, Canandaigua National Bank and Trust Company. Town of Canandaigua served on 7/9/2019, answer due 7/30/2019. (Nonkes, Steven)
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph D. Picciotti on behalf of Canandaigua National Bank and Trust Company, Lamar Advertising of Penn, LLC, Joan Purdy (Picciotti, Joseph)
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons) (BK)
July 1, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (BK)
July 1, 2019 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution (BK)
July 1, 2019 Hon. Charles J. Siragusa added. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (BK)
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Canandaigua National Bank and Trust Company. (Nonkes, Steven)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lamar Advertising of Penn, LLC. (Nonkes, Steven)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Chris Jensen, Town Board of the Town of Canandaigua, Town of Canandaigua $ 400 receipt number 0209-3504017, filed by Joan Purdy, Lamar Advertising of Penn, LLC, Canandaigua National Bank and Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Complaint - Town Ordinance, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Complaint - May 30, 2019 Letter to Purdy, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C to Complaint - May 30, 2019 Letter to CNB, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Proposed Summons to Town of Canandaigua, #6 Proposed Summons to Town Board of the Town of Canandaigua, #7 Proposed Summons to Chris Jensen, Code Enforcement Officer of the Town of Canandaigua)(Nonkes, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lamar Advertising of Penn, LLC et al v. Town of Canandaigua et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan Purdy
Represented By: Steven Paul Nonkes
Represented By: Joseph D. Picciotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Canandaigua National Bank and Trust Company
Represented By: Steven Paul Nonkes
Represented By: Joseph D. Picciotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lamar Advertising of Penn, LLC
Represented By: Steven Paul Nonkes
Represented By: Joseph D. Picciotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town Board of the Town of Canandaigua
Represented By: Andrew J. Schwab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Canandaigua
Represented By: Andrew J. Schwab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Jensen
Represented By: Andrew J. Schwab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?