Malerk v. Brockport Fire District
Plaintiff: Lisa M Malerk
Defendant: Brockport Fire District
Case Number: 6:2019cv06492
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Charles J Siragusa
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED MOTION SCHEDULING ORDER re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Brockport Fire District, ( Responses due by 10/21/2019., Replies due by 11/18/2019., Motion Hearing set for 1/30/2020 03:00 PM before Hon. Charles J. Siragusa.). Signed by Hon. Charles J. Siragusa on 8/23/19. (KAP)
August 21, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #7 Order,, Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings, by Lisa M Malerk.(Hartt, James)
August 20, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION SCHEDULING ORDER re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Brockport Fire District, ( Responses due by 9/20/2019., Replies due by 10/18/2019., Motion Hearing set for 1/30/2020 03:00 PM before Hon. Charles J. Siragusa.). Signed by Hon. Charles J. Siragusa on 8/20/19. (KAP)
August 1, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Brockport Fire District. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit Debra Bax, #3 Affidavit Attorney Affidavit, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B)(Koch, Aimee)
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lisa M Malerk. (Hartt, James)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lisa M Malerk. Brockport Fire District served on 7/12/2019, answer due 8/2/2019. (Hartt, James)
July 10, 2019 E-Filing Notification: #2 Summons Issued as to HON. LETITIA JAMES, ATTORNEY GENERAL. Modified on 7/10/2019 (TF)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Brockport Fire District. (TF)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to HON. LETITIA JAMES, ATTORNEY GENERAL. Modified on 7/10/2019 (TF).
July 2, 2019 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution(TF)
July 2, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (TF)
July 2, 2019 Case assigned to Hon. Charles J. Siragusa. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil opening. (TF)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Lisa M. Malerk against Brockport Fire District $ 400 receipt number 0209-3505292, filed by Lisa M Malerk. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - NYSDHR Determination, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B - EEOC Right to Sue, #4 Proposed Summons 1, #5 Proposed Summons 2)(Hartt, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malerk v. Brockport Fire District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa M Malerk
Represented By: James D. Hartt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brockport Fire District
Represented By: Aimee LaFever Koch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?