Martinez v. Goodman Enterprises
Plaintiff: Alysa Martinez
Defendant: Goodman Enterprises
Case Number: 6:2019cv06521
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Frank P Geraci
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Alysa Martinez (Attardo, Marlene)
August 8, 2019 E-Filing Notification: Incorrect event used to electronically file document. For future reference, use Affidavit event. No action required. #6 MOTION to Amend/Correct In Forma Pauperis. Clerk to modify entry. (TF)
August 7, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT of #2 MOTION In Forma Pauperis by Alysa Martinez. (Attachments: #1 Supplement cover letter to amended IFP)(Attardo, Marlene) Modified on 8/8/2019 (TF).
August 6, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons and complaint served on Michael Goodman on July 30, 2019, filed by Alysa Martinez. (Attardo, Marlene)
July 18, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Goodman Enterprises. (TF)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 DECISION AND ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of Court is directed to file Plaintiff's papers without payment of fees. Plaintiff's attorney shall perform the service of papers in this matter, which may be done by certified mail. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 7/16/19. (JO)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
July 15, 2019 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution(TF)
July 15, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (TF)
July 15, 2019 Case assigned to Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr.. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil opening. (TF)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Alysa Martinez.(Attardo, Marlene)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Goodman Enterprises, filed by Alysa Martinez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 summons)(Attardo, Marlene)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez v. Goodman Enterprises
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alysa Martinez
Represented By: Marlene A Attardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodman Enterprises
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?