Madison v. Crowley et al
Plaintiff: Kevin Madison
Defendant: Lieutenant Olles, Prison Guard M. Cavallero, Superintendent Crowley, Prison Guard J. Dixon and Sergeant Adino
Case Number: 6:2019cv06554
Filed: July 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Frank P Geraci
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Filing 11 Letter from Kevin Madison, dated 9/4/19, to Clerk. Copy of docket sheet mailed to pro se plaintiff. (JHF)
August 14, 2019 Filing 10 Letter from Kevin Madison, dated 8/9/19, to Clerk. (JHF)
August 12, 2019 Filing 9 PRISON AUTHORIZATION and Letter re #8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kevin Madison. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (JHF)
August 7, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kevin Madison.(TF)
August 2, 2019 Filing 7 Letter from Kevin Madison, dated 7/30/19, to Clerk. (JHF)
August 2, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kevin Madison. (JHF)
July 31, 2019 Filing 5 Letter from Kevin Madison, dated 7/25/19, to Clerk. (JHF)
July 30, 2019 Copy of #3 Order, #4 Judgment and an in forma pauperis motion form and authorization form mailed to pro se plaintiff. (JHF)
July 30, 2019 Filing 4 JUDGMENT administratively closing this action. Signed by Clerk on 7/30/19. (JHF)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER administratively closing this case. If Plaintiff wants to reopen this action, he must submit a complete in forma pauperis motion and signed authorization form or $400.00 in filing fees by 8/30/19. If Plaintiff timely submits a proper motion or the filing fees, the Clerk will reopen this case. Clerk directed to send Plaintiff an in forma pauperis motion form and authorization form. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 7/30/19. (JHF)
July 25, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Kevin Madison. (JHF)
July 24, 2019 Prisoner Pro Se Packet consisting of Privacy Notice, Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge and Civil Case Timeline mailed to plaintiff. (JHF)
July 24, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (JHF)
July 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Adino, M. Cavallero, Crowley, J. Dixon, Olles, filed by Kevin Madison. (JHF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Madison v. Crowley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lieutenant Olles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prison Guard M. Cavallero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superintendent Crowley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prison Guard J. Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Adino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Madison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?