Sadowski v. Gatehouse Media, LLC
Plaintiff: Christopher Sadowski
Defendant: Gatehouse Media, LLC
Case Number: 6:2019cv06560
Filed: July 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Marian W Payson
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Wolford
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER (Scheduling Conference set for 11/7/2019 11:40 AM before Hon. Marian W. Payson.) Signed by Hon. Marian W. Payson on 9/6/2019. (KAH)
August 28, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Gatehouse Media, LLC identifying Corporate Parent New Media Investment Group Inc. for Gatehouse Media, LLC.. (Grygiel, Michael)
August 22, 2019 ATTENTION CORPORATION PLAINTIFFS/DEFENDANTS: All Corporate Disclosure Statements pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.7.1(b) are to be filed within seven(7) days of this notice. (CGJ)
August 20, 2019 ADR Plan electronically forwarded to attorneys. The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(TF)
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Hon. Marian W. Payson for all pretrial matters excluding dispositive motions. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 8/19/2019. (LB)
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Gatehouse Media, LLC.(Grygiel, Michael)
July 29, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT ON THE FILING OR DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION OR APPEAL REGARDING A COPYRIGHT sent to Register of Copyrights (Attachments: #1 Complaint)(TF)
July 29, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Gatehouse Media, LLC. (TF)
July 29, 2019 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution(TF)
July 29, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (TF)
July 29, 2019 Case assigned to Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil opening. (TF)
July 27, 2019 Filing 2 Original Summons Filed. (Liebowitz, Richard)
July 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Gatehouse Media, LLC $ 400 receipt number 0209-3533320, filed by Christopher Sadowski. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Copyright Form)(Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sadowski v. Gatehouse Media, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Sadowski
Represented By: Richard Paul Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gatehouse Media, LLC
Represented By: Michael J. Grygiel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?