United States of America v. Bulkley et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: XYZ CORPORATION, LVNV Funding LLC, JOHN DOE, Capital One Bank (USA), NA, Scott L Bulkley, MARY ROE, Billiejean M Bulkley, Billiejean M. Bulkley, Scott L. Bulkley and Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.
Case Number: 6:2019cv06586
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Charles J Siragusa
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 12:191
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Returned Unexecuted by United States of America as to John Doe, Mary Roe, XYZ Corporation. (Labletta, Nicole)
October 4, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Billiejean M. Bulkley served on 8/31/2019, answer due 9/23/2019; Scott L. Bulkley served on 8/31/2019, answer due 9/23/2019; Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. served on 8/29/2019, answer due 9/19/2019; LVNV Funding LLC served on 8/28/2019, answer due 9/18/2019. (Labletta, Nicole)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by United States of America (Labletta, Nicole)
August 12, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (JHF)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Billiejean M. Bulkley, Scott L. Bulkley, Capital One Bank (USA), N.A., John Doe, LVNV Funding LLC, Mary Roe, XYZ Corporation. (JHF)
August 12, 2019 Case assigned to Hon. Charles J. Siragusa. Notification to chambers of on-line civil case opening. (JHF)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons)(Labletta, Nicole)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Bulkley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LVNV Funding LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Bank (USA), NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott L Bulkley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARY ROE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Billiejean M Bulkley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Billiejean M. Bulkley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott L. Bulkley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Nicole Bernadette Labletta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?