Moore v. Lee
Petitioner: Richard Moore
Respondent: William Lee
Case Number: 6:2019cv06632
Filed: August 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: David G Larimer
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of New York Northern; Case Number 9:19-cv-00880.
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DECISION AND ORDER: It is ORDERED that this action is transferred to the United States District Court for the Western District of New York; and it is further ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to electronically transfer this action to the Clerk of the Western District of New York. The Court hereby waives the fourteen (14) day waiting period provided for in Local Rule 83.6; and it is further ORDERED that the Clerk serve a copy of this Decision and Order upon petitioner in accordance with the Local Rules.Signed by Senior Judge Thomas J. McAvoy on August 26, 2019. (Copy served via regular mail on plaintiff).(rep) [Transferred from nynd on 8/28/2019.]
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER REOPENING CASE: This action was administratively closed due to petitioner's failure to comply with the filing fee requirements, and petitioner was directed to respond to the Order if he wished to pursue this action. Petitioner has now responded. The Clerk is directed to reopen this action and restore it to the Court's active docket. Signed by Senior Judge Thomas J. McAvoy on August 20, 2019. (Copy served via regular mail on petitioner at Eastern NY Correctional Facility).(rep) [Transferred from nynd on 8/28/2019.]
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 Cover Letter from Richard Moore, dated August 12, 2019, enclosing $5.00 filing fee. (rep) [Transferred from nynd on 8/28/2019.]
August 19, 2019 Filing fee received: $ 5, receipt number SYR055646. (rep) [Transferred from nynd on 8/28/2019.]
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Directing Administrative Closure with Opportunity to Comply with Filing Fee Requirement: ORDERED that because this action was not properly commenced, the Clerk is directed to administratively close this action. ORDERED that if petitioner wants to pursue this action, he must so notify the Court WITHIN THIRTY (30) DAYS of the filing date of this Order and either: (1) pay the court's filing fee of five dollars ($5.00); or (2) submit a completed and signed IFP Application that has been certified by an appropriate prison official at his facility. Signed by Senior Judge Thomas J. McAvoy on 7/23/19. {order and blank ifp form served via regular mail on petitioner}(nas) [Transferred from nynd on 8/28/2019.]
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Richard Moore. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(nas) [Transferred from nynd on 8/28/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Richard Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?