Freeman v. NYS DOCCS
Petitioner: Marcus C. Freeman
Respondent: NYS DOCCS
Case Number: 6:2019cv06633
Filed: August 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Frank P Geraci
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of New York Northern; Case Number 9:19-cv-00926.
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DECISION AND ORDER: ORDERED that this action is transferred to the United States District Court for the Western District of New York. Signed by Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 8/27/19. {order served via regular mail on petitioner}(nas, ) [Transferred from nynd on 8/28/2019.]
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER REOPENING CASE: This action was administratively closed due to petitioner's failure to comply with the filing fee requirements, and petitioner was directed to respond to the Order if s/he wished to pursue this action. Petitioner has now responded. The Clerk is directed to reopen this action and restore it to the Court's active docket. Authorized by Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 8/19/19. {text order served via regular mail on petitioner}(nas) [Transferred from nynd on 8/28/2019.]
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Marcus C. Freeman. (nas, ) [Transferred from nynd on 8/28/2019.]
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Directing Administrative Closure with Opportunity to Comply with Filing Fee Requirement. It is ORDERED that because this action was not properly commenced, the Clerk is directed to administratively close this action; and it is further ORDERED that if petitioner wants to pursue this action, he must so notify the Court WITHIN THIRTY (30) DAYS of the filing date of this Order and either: (1) pay the court's filing fee of five dollars ($5.00); or (2) submit a completed and signed IFP Application that has been certified by an appropriate prison official at his facility. Signed by Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe on July 30, 2019. {Copy served via regular mail along with a blank IFP Application Form}(rep) [Transferred from nynd on 8/28/2019.]
July 30, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Marcus C. Freeman. (Mailing envelope included)(meb) [Transferred from nynd on 8/28/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Freeman v. NYS DOCCS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: NYS DOCCS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Marcus C. Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?