Barber v. Steuben County
Plaintiff: Tracy Barber
Defendant: Steuben County
Case Number: 6:2019cv06640
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: David G Larimer
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. Pro Se Packet mailed to plaintiff consisting of Privacy Notice, ADR information, Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge, and Civil Case Timeline. (LB)
August 30, 2019 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation. The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution (LB)
August 30, 2019 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of New York Northern; Case Number 3:19-cv-01067.
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE - That the Clerk of the Court transfer this matter to the United States District Court for the Western District of New York pursuant to Local Rule 83.6(a) of the Northern District of New York. That the Clerk of this Court advise the clerk of the Western District of New York of the entry of this order and provide all information necessary for the clerk of the Western District to electronically access the documents filed in this action, The Court hereby waives the fourteen (140 day waiting period provided for in Local Rule 83.6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 8/27/2019. (Copy served via regular mail upon plaintiff)(jel, ) [Transferred from nynd on 8/30/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL filed by Tracy Barber. Motions referred to Miroslav Lovric. (jel, ) [Transferred from nynd on 8/30/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Tracy Barber. Motions referred to Miroslav Lovric. (jel, ) [Transferred from nynd on 8/30/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Steuben County filed by Tracy Barber. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of Service, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(jel, ) [Transferred from nynd on 8/30/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barber v. Steuben County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Barber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steuben County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?