DeLaney v. Pariso et al
Plaintiff: Clarence Delaney, Jr.
Defendant: Ms. Amisano, Mr. Heller, Ms. Bannister, David Dinello, Mr. Pariso, David Infantino and M. Smith
Case Number: 6:2019cv06656
Filed: September 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Charles J Siragusa
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Filing 13 Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 7:19-cv-06084.
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 INFORMATION PACKAGE MAILED to Clarence DeLaney, Jr., at 834 State Street Schenectady, NY 12304, on 9/3/2019 Re: #11 Order of Service via REGULAR MAIL. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: a copy of the order of service or order to answer and other orders entered to date, the individual practices of the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to your case, Instructions for Litigants Who Do Not Have Attorneys, Notice Regarding Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Case Files, a flyer about the free legal assistance clinic located in the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse (only in non prisoner cases), a Motions guide, a notice that the Pro Se Manual has been discontinued, a Notice of Change of Address form to use if your contact information changes, a handout explaining matters handled by magistrate judges and consent form to complete if all parties agree to proceed for all purposes before the magistrate judge, a form for you to complete if you consent to receive filings electronically (only in nonprisoner cases). (bwa) [Transferred from nysd on 9/5/2019.]
September 3, 2019 FRCP 4 SERVICE PACKAGE HAND DELIVERED TO U.S.M.: on 9/3/2019 Re: Judge Nelson Stephen Roman #11 Order of Service. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: Summons, IFP, Order of Service, Completed U.S.M. form(s) for defendant(s)Ada Perez, Melissa M. Pickett, Shanikqua Harrison, Dr. W. Stolfi, Dr. Quinones. (bwa) [Transferred from nysd on 9/5/2019.]
September 3, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Shanikqua Harrison, Ada Perez, Melissa M. Pickett, Quinones, W. Stolfi. (bwa) [Transferred from nysd on 9/5/2019.]
August 30, 2019 PARTY TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY pertaining to Pariso, Smith, Bannister, Amisano, Dinello, Heller, and Infantino only, from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - Western District of New York (rj) [Transferred from nysd on 9/5/2019.]
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF SERVICE: The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, together with an information package. The Court severs from this action the Willard claims and transfers those claims - which includes all claims brought against Pariso, Smith, Bannister, Amisano, Dinello, Heller, and Infantino - to the United States District Court for the Western District of New York. The Clerk of Court is further instructed to complete the USM-285 forms with the addresses for Perez, Pickett, Harrison, Stolfi, and Quinones and deliver all documents necessary to effect service to the U.S. Marshals Service. The Court denies Plaintiff's motion for the appointment of counsel, ECF No. 5, without prejudice to renewal at a later date. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962) (holding that an appellant demonstrates good faith when he seeks review of a nonfrivolous issue). The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962)., Motions terminated: #5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel. filed by Clarence DeLaney, Jr.., David Dinello (Reginald Health Services Director), Heller (Drill Instructor, Willard DTC), David Infantino (ADA Cordinator), Pariso (Deputy Superintendent of Program Willard), M. Smith (Acting Superintendent of Program Willard DTC), Amisano (Nurse Practioner, Willard DTC) and Bannister (Nurse Administrator, Willard DTC) terminated. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 8/30/2019) (rj) Transmission to Pro Se Assistants for processing. [Transferred from nysd on 9/5/2019.]
August 27, 2019 Filing 10 PRO SE MEMORANDUM(Letter) dated 8/21/19 re: CHANGE OF ADDRESS for Clarence DeLaney, Jr. New Address: 834 State Street, Schenectady, NY, 12307. (sc) [Transferred from nysd on 9/5/2019.]
August 20, 2019 Filing 9 PRO SE MEMORANDUM(Notice of Address Change), dated 8/15/19 re: CHANGE OF ADDRESS for Clarence DeLaney, Jr. New Address: 428 Duane Ave., Schenectady, NY, 12304. (sc) [Transferred from nysd on 9/5/2019.]
August 20, 2019 Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (wb) [Transferred from nysd on 9/5/2019.]
August 20, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman. Judge Colleen McMahon is no longer assigned to the case. (wb) [Transferred from nysd on 9/5/2019.]
August 20, 2019 Mailed a copy of #7 Order Granting IFP Application in Prisoner Case, to Superintendent at Fishkill Correctional Facility 271 Matteawan Road P.O. Box 1245 Beacon, NY 12508-0307 and to Clarence DeLaney, Jr. 428 Duane Ave Schenectady, NY 12304. (aea) [Transferred from nysd on 9/5/2019.]
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION IN PRISONER CASE: Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed without prepayment of fees is granted. A prisoner bringing a civil action is required to pay the full $350 filing fee even when proceeding in forma pauperis (IFP), that is, without prepayment of fees.... The Court must collect, when funds exist in a prisoner's account, an initial partial filing fee plus monthly payments. The Clerk of Court is directed to send a copy of this order and the prisoner authorization to the agency having custody of Plaintiff. That agency is directed to forward copies of Plaintiff's prison trust fund account for the past six months and to disburse the payments required under 28 U.S.C. 1915 to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York and to include the above docket number on the disbursement before sending it to the Court. If Plaintiff is transferred to another facility, the current facility shall provide a copy of this order to the facility to which Plaintiff is transferred. The Clerk of Court is also directed to send a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. Finally, it is Plaintiff's obligation to promptly submit a written notification to the Court if Plaintiff's address changes, and the Court may dismiss the action if Plaintiff fails to do so. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 8/20/2019) (sac) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. [Transferred from nysd on 9/5/2019.]
August 15, 2019 Filing 6 PRO SE MEMORANDUM re: CHANGE OF ADDRESS for Clarence DeLaney, Jr. New Address: 428 Duane Ave., Schenectady, NY 12304. (rdz) Modified on 8/20/2019 (sac). [Transferred from nysd on 9/5/2019.]
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL. Document filed by Clarence DeLaney, Jr. (vn) Modified on 8/20/2019 (sac). [Transferred from nysd on 9/5/2019.]
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 PRISONER AUTHORIZATION. Document filed by Clarence DeLaney, Jr.(sc) Modified on 8/20/2019 (sac). [Transferred from nysd on 9/5/2019.]
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 APPLICATION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS. Document filed by Clarence DeLaney, Jr.(sc) Modified on 8/20/2019 (sac). [Transferred from nysd on 9/5/2019.]
July 9, 2019 Mailed a copy of #2 Order Directing Payment of Fee or IFP Application & Prisoner Authorization, to Clarence Delancy, Jr. DIN No. 17A0236 Fishkill Correctional Facility 271 Matteawan Road P.O. Box 1245 Beacon, NY 12508-0307. (aea) [Transferred from nysd on 9/5/2019.]
July 8, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (jc) [Transferred from nysd on 9/5/2019.]
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER DIRECTING PAYMENT OF FEE OR IFP APPLICATION & PRISONER AUTHORIZATION: Plaintiff is directed to render payment of the filing fee or submit an IFP application & Prisoner Authorization to this Court's Pro Se Office within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Filing Fee due by 8/7/2019. In Forma Pauperis (IFP) Application due by 8/7/2019. Prisoner Authorization Form due by 8/7/2019. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 7/8/2019) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit IFP application, #2 Exhibit prisoner authorization)(asg) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. [Transferred from nysd on 9/5/2019.]
June 28, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sac) [Transferred from nysd on 9/5/2019.]
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Amisano, Bannister, David Dinello, Shanikqua Harrison, Heller, David Infantino, Pariso, Ada Perez, Melissa M. Pickett, Quinones, M. Smith, W. Stolfi. Document filed by Clarence DeLaney, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Letter) (sac) Modified on 8/20/2019 (sac). [Transferred from nysd on 9/5/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DeLaney v. Pariso et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Amisano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Heller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Bannister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Dinello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Pariso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Infantino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarence Delaney, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?