Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Green Lantern Inn, Inc.
Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Defendant: Green Lantern Inn, Inc., d/b/a Mr. Dominic's on Main
Case Number: 6:2019cv06704
Filed: September 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Green Lantern Inn, Inc.. (Shepard, Mary)
November 20, 2019 ATTENTION CORPORATION PLAINTIFFS/DEFENDANTS: All Corporate Disclosure Statements pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.7.1(b) are to be filed within seven(7) days of this notice. (CGJ)
November 18, 2019 Filing 7 TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Hon. Mark W. Pedersen, United States Magistrate Judge, for all pretrial matters excluding dispositive motions. The parties are encouraged to consider consenting to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). Consent forms are available from the Magistrate Judge's chambers or the Clerk of Court's office. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 11/18/2019. (MFM)
November 15, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Green Lantern Inn, Inc. (Wolford, Michael)
November 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. Wolford on behalf of Green Lantern Inn, Inc. (Wolford, Michael)
November 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary E. Shepard on behalf of Green Lantern Inn, Inc. (Shepard, Mary)
November 6, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Sara Smolik on behalf of Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (Smolik, Sara)
October 7, 2019 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. Green Lantern Inn, Inc. waiver sent on 9/25/2019, answer due 11/25/2019. (Fox-Solomon, Elizabeth)
September 24, 2019 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation. The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution (JHF)
September 24, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (JHF)
September 24, 2019 E-Filing Notification: Summons to be issued by Clerk not filed by attorney at case opening. Attorney directed to electronically file proposed summons as "Continuation of Exhibits" to #1 Complaint. (JHF)
September 24, 2019 Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. added. Notification to chambers of on-line civil case opening. (JHF)
September 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Green Lantern Inn, Inc., filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Fox-Solomon, Elizabeth) Modified on 9/24/2019 (JHF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Green Lantern Inn, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Lantern Inn, Inc., d/b/a Mr. Dominic's on Main
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Represented By: Elizabeth M. Fox-Solomon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?