Doe v. Palma
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Defendant: David A Palma
Case Number: 6:2019cv06709
Filed: September 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Michael A. Telesca
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time for defendant to answer until November 27 2019.. Signed by Hon. Michael A. Telesca on 10/31/19. (JMC)
October 30, 2019 E-Filing Notification: Document contains so ordered line and should be submitted via e-mail to the assigned judge. Refer to the Administrative Guide for e-mail addresses. No action required #4 STIPULATION and Order extending time to Answer by David A Palma. (Cooman, Kevin) (BK)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STIPULATION and Order extending time to Answer by David A Palma. (Cooman, Kevin)
October 15, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service of the Summons and Complaint served on David Palma on 10/09/2019, filed by Jane Doe. (Nichols, Pamela)
September 25, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to David A Palma. (BK)
September 25, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (BK)
September 25, 2019 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution (BK)
September 25, 2019 Case Assigned to Hon. Michael A. Telesca. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (BK)
September 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against David A Palma $ 400 receipt number 0209-3598736, filed by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Nichols, Pamela)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Palma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A Palma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: Pamela A. Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?