Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC v. CNC Ultra Inc. f/k/a New Market Products Company, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC
Defendant: James L. Allard, CNC Ultra Inc. f/k/a New Market Products Company, Inc., Dorothy A. McCann, Wendy L. Allard, Cindy Bergeron, New York Natural Gas Association, Sydney B. Shirk, Robert G. Buono, Kane J. McAfee, Mary Jane Shirk, Christopher W. Bason, Stephen Paul McCann, Karan Zylinski, Paula M. Wilson, Heirs or Assigns of Beatrice Glover, Heirs or Assigns of Harold W. Lane, Sr. and Unknown Persons and Interested Parties
In Re: Easements for the storage of natural gas underlying properties in Steuben and Schuyler Counties, New York
Case Number: 6:2019cv06746
Filed: October 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Marian W Payson
Referring Judge: Charles J Siragusa
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 43:946
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2019 Filing 18 SERVICE by Publication filed by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. Last publication date 12/02/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Burt, Stefanie)
December 5, 2019 Filing 17 TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Hon. Marian W. Payson. The Magistrate Judge is hereby designated to act in this case as follows: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), all pre-trial matters in this case are referred to the above-named United States Magistrate Judge, including but not limited to: (1) conduct of a scheduling conference and entry of a scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, (2) hearing and disposition of all non-dispositive motions or applications, (3) supervision of discovery, and (4) supervision of all procedural matters involving the aforementioned or involving the preparation of the case or any matter therein for consideration by the District Judge. All non-dispositive motions or applications shall be filed with the Clerk and made returnable before the Magistrate Judge. The parties are encouraged to consider the provisions of 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) governing consent to either partial or complete disposition of the case, including trial if necessary, by the Magistrate Judge. Consent forms are available from the office of the Magistrate Judge or the office of the Clerk of Court. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Charles J. Siragusa on 12/5/19. Copy of this NEF mailed to pro se defendant, Gary Osborne, President, CNC Ultra, Inc. f/k/a New Market Products Company, Inc., 9671 Back Street, Dundee, NY 14837. (KJA)
November 6, 2019 ATTENTION CORPORATION PLAINTIFFS/DEFENDANTS: All Corporate Disclosure Statements pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.7.1(b) are to be filed within seven (7) days of this notice. (CGJ)
November 4, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Burt, Stefanie)
October 29, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by CNC Ultra Inc. f/k/a New Market Products Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (JHF)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Hon. Charles J. Siragusa on 10/29/19. (KAP)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
October 28, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC (Burt, Stefanie)
October 28, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC identifying Corporate Parent TC Energy Corporation for Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC.. (Burt, Stefanie)
October 25, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. Karan Zylinski served on 10/16/2019, answer due 11/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Condemnation)(Burt, Stefanie)
October 25, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. Paula M. Wilson served on 10/15/2019, answer due 11/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Condemnation)(Burt, Stefanie)
October 25, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. Dorothy A. McCann served on 10/15/2019, answer due 11/5/2019; Stephen Paul McCann served on 10/15/2019, answer due 11/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Condemnation)(Burt, Stefanie)
October 25, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. CNC Ultra Inc. f/k/a New Market Products Company, Inc. served on 10/15/2019, answer due 11/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Condemnation)(Burt, Stefanie)
October 25, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. Mary Jane Shirk served on 10/16/2019, answer due 11/6/2019; Sydney B. Shirk served on 10/16/2019, answer due 11/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Condemnation)(Burt, Stefanie)
October 25, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. Cindy Bergeron served on 10/15/2019, answer due 11/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Condemnation)(Burt, Stefanie)
October 25, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. James L. Allard served on 10/22/2019, answer due 11/12/2019; Wendy L. Allard served on 10/22/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Condemnation)(Burt, Stefanie)
October 25, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. Kane J. McAfee served on 10/22/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Condemnation)(Burt, Stefanie)
October 25, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. Robert G. Buono served on 10/15/2019, answer due 11/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Condemnation)(Burt, Stefanie)
October 11, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC identifying Corporate Parent TransCanada Corporation, Other Affiliate TransCanada Trust, Other Affiliate TransCanada Pipeline Limited for Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC.. (Burt, Stefanie)
October 9, 2019 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation. The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution (JHF)
October 9, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (JHF)
October 9, 2019 E-Filing Notification: summonses to be issued by Clerk not included with initial case opening documents. Required follow-up: plaintiff's attorney directed to electronically file summonses to be issued as "Continuation of Exhibits" to #1 Complaint. (JHF)
October 9, 2019 Case assigned to Hon. Charles J. Siragusa. Notification to chambers of on-line civil case opening. (JHF)
October 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants $ 400 receipt number 0209-3614816, filed by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Burt, Stefanie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC v. CNC Ultra Inc. f/k/a New Market Products Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James L. Allard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CNC Ultra Inc. f/k/a New Market Products Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorothy A. McCann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy L. Allard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy Bergeron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York Natural Gas Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sydney B. Shirk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert G. Buono
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kane J. McAfee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Jane Shirk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher W. Bason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Paul McCann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karan Zylinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paula M. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heirs or Assigns of Beatrice Glover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heirs or Assigns of Harold W. Lane, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Persons and Interested Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC
Represented By: Stefanie Lepore Burt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Easements for the storage of natural gas underlying properties in Steuben and Schuyler Counties, New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?