Stensrud et al v. Rochester Genesee Regional Transportation Authority
Plaintiff: JOHN R. STENSRUD and MARIA B. STENSRUD
Defendant: Rochester Genesee Regional Transportation Authority
Case Number: 6:2019cv06753
Filed: October 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Michael A. Telesca
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen M. Bennett on behalf of Rochester Genesee Regional Transportation Authority (Bennett, Kathleen)
November 8, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Suzanne O. Galbato on behalf of Rochester Genesee Regional Transportation Authority (Galbato, Suzanne)
November 8, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie M. Campbell on behalf of Rochester Genesee Regional Transportation Authority (Campbell, Stephanie)
November 8, 2019 E-Filing Notification: RE #7 NOTICE of Appearance and #5 NOTICE of Appearance. Layout incorrect re PDF attachment. Action required: refile.pdf right side up (portrait mode) (TF)
November 8, 2019 Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting request of Defendants for an extension of time until December 9, 2019 to file an answer or move in response to the Complaint. Signed by Hon. Michael A. Telesca on 11/8/19. (JMC)
November 7, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint Letter Motion for Extension Letter-Response to Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by John R. Stensrud, Maria B. Stensrud. (Refermat, John)
November 7, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie M. Campbell on behalf of Rochester Genesee Regional Transportation Authority (Campbell, Stephanie)
November 7, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint Letter Motion for Extension by Rochester Genesee Regional Transportation Authority.(Galbato, Suzanne)
November 7, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Suzanne O. Galbato on behalf of Rochester Genesee Regional Transportation Authority (Galbato, Suzanne)
October 18, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maria B. Stensrud, John R. Stensrud. Rochester Genesee Regional Transportation Authority served on 10/18/2019, answer due 11/8/2019. (Refermat, John)
October 10, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Rochester Genesee Regional Transportation Authority. (TF)
October 10, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (TF)
October 10, 2019 Case assigned to Hon. Michael A. Telesca. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil opening. (TF)
October 9, 2019 Filing 2 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS to #1 Complaint SUMMONS. (Refermat, John)
October 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Rochester Genesee Regional Transportation Authority $ 400 receipt number 0209-3616630, filed by MARIA B. STENSRUD, JOHN R. STENSRUD. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Refermat, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stensrud et al v. Rochester Genesee Regional Transportation Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN R. STENSRUD
Represented By: John T. Refermat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIA B. STENSRUD
Represented By: John T. Refermat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rochester Genesee Regional Transportation Authority
Represented By: Suzanne O. Galbato
Represented By: Kathleen M. Bennett
Represented By: Stephanie M. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?