Trotman v. Riley et al
Plaintiff: David Michael Trotman, Jr.
Defendant: Mess Hall Director at Five Points, Allen Riley, Deputy Superintendent of Programs at Five Points, Jeff McCoy and Anthony Annucci
Case Number: 6:2019cv06876
Filed: November 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Charles J Siragusa
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Compel by David Michael Trotman, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (JHF)
December 26, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by David Michael Trotman, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (JHF)
December 26, 2019 Change of Address. Plaintiff's address changed to: David Michael Trotman, Jr., 18-A-4180, DOWNSTATE CORRECTIONAL FACILITY, Box F, Fishkill, NY 12524. (JHF)
December 6, 2019 Copy of #4 Judgment, #3 Order and a form motion to proceed in forma pauperis with supporting affirmation mailed to pro se plaintiff. (JHF)
December 6, 2019 Filing 4 JUDGMENT administratively terminating the case. Signed by Clerk on 12/6/19. (JHF)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Clerk directed to administratively terminate this action. If Plaintiff wishes to reopen this action, he shall pay the filing fees of $400.00, or notify the Court in writing as directed no latter than 30 days from the date of this order. Clerk directed to send to Plaintiff a form motion to proceed in forma pauperis with supporting affirmation. Signed by Hon. Charles J. Siragusa on 12/3/19. Signed by Hon. Charles J. Siragusa on 12/3/19. (JHF)
November 27, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. Prisoner Pro Se Packet mailed to plaintiff consisting of Privacy Notice, Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge and Civil Case Timeline. (LB)
November 18, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by David Michael Trotman, Jr. (LB)
November 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Anthony Annucci, Deputy Superintendent of Programs at Five Points, Jeff McCoy, Mess Hall Director at Five Points, Allen Riley, filed by David Michael Trotman, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(LB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trotman v. Riley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Michael Trotman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mess Hall Director at Five Points
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Superintendent of Programs at Five Points
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Annucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?