Farm Sanctuary, et al. v. United States Department of Agriculture et al
Plaintiff: Farm Sanctuary, Animal Equality, Compassion Over Killing, Mercy For Animals, Inc., Animal Legal Defense Fund, Center for Biological Diversity and North Carolina Farmed Animal Save
Defendant: United States Department of Agriculture, Food Safety and Inspection Service, Administrator Carmen Rottenberg and Carmen Rottenberg
Case Number: 6:2019cv06910
Filed: December 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth A Wolford
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting defendants' request for an extension of time to answer. Answer due date updated as to Carmen Rottenberg answer due 3/13/2020, United States Department of Agriculture answer due 3/13/2020. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 2/20/2020. (TF)
February 10, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean Christian Duffy on behalf of All Defendants (Duffy, Sean)
February 10, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley Thomas Craigmyle on behalf of All Defendants (Craigmyle, Bradley)
February 3, 2020 Filing 16 TEXT ORDER granting Kelsey R. Eberly and Cristina Stella's #14 Motion to appear pro hac vice and #15 Motion for Waiver of Local Counsel Requirement. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on February 3, 2020. (JT) -CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
February 3, 2020 Confirmed admission to CA state bar for attorneys Eberly and Stella (TF)
January 24, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for waiver of Local Counsel requirement by Cristina Stella and Kelsey Eberly of Animal Legal Defense Fund.(TF)
January 24, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to appear pro hac vice by Kelsey Eberly and Cristina Stella by Animal Legal Defense Fund. (Attachments: #1 Motion by Cristina Stella)(TF)
January 24, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Filing fees paid: receipt number ROC012025 $150.00, ROC012026 $150.00 (TF)
January 22, 2020 Filing 13 TEXT ORDER. In light of its procedural posture, the Court has determined that this matter should be exempted from participation in the Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution Plan (the "ADR Plan"). See ADR Plan, Section 2.2(D) ("The assigned District Judge... may, sua sponte, exempt any case from the ADR Plan."). The Clerk of Court is instructed to terminate the automatic referral to the ADR Plan. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 1/22/2020. (CDH) -CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
January 13, 2020 ATTENTION CORPORATION PLAINTIFFS/DEFENDANTS: All Corporate Disclosure Statements pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.7.1(b) are to be filed within seven(7) days of this notice. (CGJ)
January 8, 2020 Filing 12 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice and Motion for Waiver of Local Counsel Requirement by Animal Equality. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on January 8, 2020. (JT)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
January 6, 2020 RE: #7 , #8 and #9 -SUMMONS Returned Executed by Compassion Over Killing, Animal Legal Defense Fund, Animal Equality, Mercy For Animals, Inc., Center for Biological Diversity, North Carolina Farmed Animal Save, Farm Sanctuary. Food Safety and Inspection Service served on 12/23/2019, answer due 2/24/2020; Carmen Rottenberg served on 12/23/2019, answer due 2/24/2020; United States Department of Agriculture served on 12/23/2019, answer due 2/24/2020. (TF)
January 6, 2020 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on James Kennedy Jr on 12/23/19, filed by Animal Equality, Animal Legal Defense Fund, Center for Biological Diversity, Compassion Over Killing, Farm Sanctuary, Mercy For Animals, Inc., North Carolina Farned Animal Save. (Winders, Delcianna)
January 6, 2020 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on William Barr on 12/26/19, filed by Animal Equality, Animal Legal Defense Fund, Center for Biological Diversity, Compassion Over Killing, Farm Sanctuary, Mercy For Animals, Inc., North Carolina Farned Animal Save. (Winders, Delcianna)
January 6, 2020 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Food Safety and Inspection Service on 12/23/19, filed by Animal Equality, Animal Legal Defense Fund, Center for Biological Diversity, Compassion Over Killing, Farm Sanctuary, Mercy For Animals, Inc., North Carolina Farned Animal Save. (Winders, Delcianna)
January 6, 2020 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on United States Department of Agriculture on 12/23/19, filed by Animal Equality, Animal Legal Defense Fund, Center for Biological Diversity, Compassion Over Killing, Farm Sanctuary, Mercy For Animals, Inc., North Carolina Farned Animal Save. (Winders, Delcianna)
January 6, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Carmen Rottenberg, USDA Administrator, on 12/23/19, filed by Animal Equality, Animal Legal Defense Fund, Center for Biological Diversity, Compassion Over Killing, Farm Sanctuary, Mercy For Animals, Inc., North Carolina Farned Animal Save. (Winders, Delcianna)
December 30, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to appear pro hac vice by Sarah Hanneken, MOTION for waiver of Local counsel requirement by Animal Equality. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Fee paid ROC011972 $150.00(TF)
December 27, 2019 Filing 5 Student Practice Approvals (TF)
December 19, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Food Safety and Inspection Service, Carmen Rottenberg, United States Department of Agriculture. (Attachments: #1 summons, #2 summons, #3 summons, #4 summons)(TF)
December 19, 2019 E-Filing Notification: All parties should be added during case opening, Clerk to add party plaintiffs. No action required re Party Animal Equality, Animal Legal Defense Fund, Center for Biological Diversity, Compassion Over Killing, Mercy For Animals, Inc. and North Carolina Farned Animal Save added. (TF)
December 19, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (TF)
December 19, 2019 Case assigned to Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil opening. (TF)
December 19, 2019 Terminated per text order #13 - AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution
December 18, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Farm Sanctuary. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Corporate Disclosure Statement, #2 Supplement Corporate Disclosure Statement, #3 Supplement Corporate Disclosure Statement, #4 Supplement Corporate Disclosure Statement, #5 Supplement Corporate Disclosure Statement, #6 Supplement Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Winders, Delcianna)
December 18, 2019 Filing 2 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS to #1 Complaint . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Summons, #2 Certificate of Service Summons, #3 Certificate of Service Summons, #4 Certificate of Service Summons, #5 Attachment to Summons)(Winders, Delcianna)
December 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR VACATUR, DECLARATORY, AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against All Defendants $ 400 receipt number 0209-3684875, filed by Farm Sanctuary. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Winders, Delcianna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farm Sanctuary, et al. v. United States Department of Agriculture et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Agriculture
Represented By: Bradley Thomas Craigmyle
Represented By: Sean Christian Duffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Food Safety and Inspection Service
Represented By: Bradley Thomas Craigmyle
Represented By: Sean Christian Duffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Administrator Carmen Rottenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carmen Rottenberg
Represented By: Bradley Thomas Craigmyle
Represented By: Sean Christian Duffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farm Sanctuary
Represented By: Delcianna Joy Winders
Represented By: Hannah M.M. Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Animal Equality
Represented By: Sarah K. Hanneken
Represented By: Hannah M.M. Connor
Represented By: Delcianna Joy Winders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Compassion Over Killing
Represented By: Hannah M.M. Connor
Represented By: Delcianna Joy Winders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mercy For Animals, Inc.
Represented By: Hannah M.M. Connor
Represented By: Delcianna Joy Winders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Animal Legal Defense Fund
Represented By: Kelsey R. Eberly
Represented By: Cristina Stella
Represented By: Hannah M.M. Connor
Represented By: Delcianna Joy Winders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity
Represented By: Hannah M.M. Connor
Represented By: Delcianna Joy Winders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North Carolina Farmed Animal Save
Represented By: Hannah M.M. Connor
Represented By: Delcianna Joy Winders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?