McGaffick v. National Boy Scouts of America Foundation et al
Plaintiff: Robert McGaffick
Defendant: Sullivan Trail Council, The Boy Scouts of America, Iroquois Trail Council, The Boy Scouts of America, Greater Niagara Frontier Council, Boy Scouts of America, Seneca Waterways Council, The Boy Scouts of America, National Boy Scouts of America Foundation a/k/a The Boy Scouts of America, National Boy Scouts of America Foundation and The Boy Scouts of America
Case Number: 6:2020cv06137
Filed: March 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Frank P Geraci
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1452
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE by Greater Niagara Frontier Council, Boy Scouts of America, Iroquois Trail Council, The Boy Scouts of America, National Boy Scouts of America Foundation, Seneca Waterways Council, The Boy Scouts of America, Sullivan Trail Council, The Boy Scouts of America NOTICE OF ENTRY OF CONSENT ORDER PURSUANT TO 11 U.S.C. 105(a) AND 362 GRANTING THE BSAS MOTION FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent Order)(Beckwith, Mathew)
March 26, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Mathew W. Beckwith on behalf of Greater Niagara Frontier Council, Boy Scouts of America, Iroquois Trail Council, The Boy Scouts of America, National Boy Scouts of America Foundation, Seneca Waterways Council, The Boy Scouts of America, Sullivan Trail Council, The Boy Scouts of America (Beckwith, Mathew)
March 16, 2020 Filing 4 TEXT ORDER granting, in part, #3 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. The parties shall file a joint status report by 3/31/2020 addressing the status of relevant proceedings before the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware and the impact of those proceedings on this matter. In the alternative, Greater Niagara Frontier Council, Boy Scouts of America may answer by 3/31/2020, but the answer deadline for those parties is otherwise stayed. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 3/16/2020. (SR)
March 13, 2020 Filing 3 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Greater Niagara Frontier Council, Boy Scouts of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Burden, Donna)
March 6, 2020 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (CGJ)
March 6, 2020 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(CGJ)
March 6, 2020 Case assigned to Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (CGJ)
March 5, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE by Greater Niagara Frontier Council, Boy Scouts of America, Iroquois Trail Council, The Boy Scouts of America, National Boy Scouts of America Foundation a/k/a The Boy Scouts of America, Seneca Waterways Council, The Boy Scouts of America, Sullivan Trail Council, The Boy Scouts of America NOTICE OF (I) COMMENCEMENT OF ADVERSARY PROCEEDING AND FILING OF MOTION FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION BY THE BSA, (II) MEETING TO CONSIDER THE FORMATION OF AN OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF CREDITORS AND (III) FILING OF MOTION BY THE BSA DEBTORS TO FIX VENUE FOR CLAIMS RELATED TO THE BANKRUPTCY UNDER 28 U.S.C. 157(b)(5) AND 1334(b) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Burden, Donna)
March 5, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Sullivan Trail Council, The Boy Scouts of America, Seneca Waterways Council, The Boy Scouts of America, Greater Niagara Frontier Council, Boy Scouts of America, National Boy Scouts of America Foundation a/k/a The Boy Scouts of America, Iroquois Trail Council, The Boy Scouts of America from Monroe County Supreme Court, case number E2020001879. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0209-3759652), filed by Sullivan Trail Council, The Boy Scouts of America, Seneca Waterways Council, The Boy Scouts of America, Greater Niagara Frontier Council, Boy Scouts of America, National Boy Scouts of America Foundation a/k/a The Boy Scouts of America, Iroquois Trail Council, The Boy Scouts of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Docket Report, #3 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #4 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Burden, Donna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McGaffick v. National Boy Scouts of America Foundation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert McGaffick
Represented By: Fred R. Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sullivan Trail Council, The Boy Scouts of America
Represented By: Donna L. Burden
Represented By: Mathew W. Beckwith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iroquois Trail Council, The Boy Scouts of America
Represented By: Donna L. Burden
Represented By: Mathew W. Beckwith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greater Niagara Frontier Council, Boy Scouts of America
Represented By: Donna L. Burden
Represented By: Mathew W. Beckwith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seneca Waterways Council, The Boy Scouts of America
Represented By: Donna L. Burden
Represented By: Mathew W. Beckwith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Boy Scouts of America Foundation a/k/a The Boy Scouts of America
Represented By: Donna L. Burden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Boy Scouts of America Foundation
Represented By: Donna L. Burden
Represented By: Mathew W. Beckwith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Boy Scouts of America
Represented By: Donna L. Burden
Represented By: Mathew W. Beckwith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?