Kuligowski v. HD Development of Maryland, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Blaine Kuligowski
Defendant: HD Development of Maryland, Inc. and Home Depot USA, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2020cv06483
Filed: July 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Marian W Payson
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Wolford
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2020 Filing 7 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Marian W. Payson: Telephone Conference held on 9/3/2020. Counsel for defendant advised that new counsel for defendant will be filing a notice of appearance. Telephone Scheduling Conference will be rescheduled to mid-October, 2020.Appearances: Robert D. Berkun, Esq. and Steven W. Williams, Esq. (CAM)
September 2, 2020 Filing 6 Letter filed by Home Depot USA, Inc., HD Development of Maryland, Inc. as to Home Depot USA, Inc., HD Development of Maryland, Inc. . (Williams, Steven)
July 30, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by HD Development of Maryland, Inc., Home Depot USA, Inc.. (Williams, Steven)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER (Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 9/3/2020 10:40 AM before Hon. Marian W. Payson. Counsel will be provided dial-in instructions by email prior to the conference.) Signed by Hon. Marian W. Payson on 7/22/2020. (KAH)
July 22, 2020 ATTENTION CORPORATION PLAINTIFFS/DEFENDANTS: All Corporate Disclosure Statements pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.7.1(b) are to be filed within seven(7) days of this notice. (MD)
July 20, 2020 Filing 3 TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Hon. Marian W. Payson for all pretrial matters excluding dispositive motions. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 7/20/2020. (TF)
July 20, 2020 ADR Plan electronically forwarded to attorneys. The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(TF)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by HD Development of Maryland, Inc., Home Depot USA, Inc..(Williams, Steven)
July 10, 2020 E-Filing Notification: Action Required: Attorney is directed to file an index identifying State Court documents pursuant to local rule 81(A). (JD)
July 10, 2020 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (JD)
July 10, 2020 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(JD)
July 10, 2020 Case Assigned to Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (JD)
July 9, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Home Depot USA, Inc., HD Development of Maryland, Inc. from Supreme Court - County of Niagara, case number E172110/2020. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0209-3895023), filed by Home Depot USA, Inc., HD Development of Maryland, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Certificate of Service)(Williams, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kuligowski v. HD Development of Maryland, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blaine Kuligowski
Represented By: Robert D. Berkun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HD Development of Maryland, Inc.
Represented By: Steven Ward Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot USA, Inc.
Represented By: Steven Ward Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?