Bartosiewicz v. Nelsen
Plaintiff: Robert J. Bartosiewicz
Defendant: Greg Nelsen
Case Number: 6:2020cv06513
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth A Wolford
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2020 Filing 6 TEXT ORDER re #5 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Responses shall be due on or before September 30, 2020. Replies shall be due on or before October 7, 2020. Upon receipt of all papers, the Court will determine if oral argument is necessary and, if so, will advise the parties of the date and time. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on September 9, 2020. (JT)
September 9, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Greg Nelsen. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Mallory Smith Declaration with Exhibits, #2 Declaration Gregory Nelson Declaration, #3 Memorandum in Support, #4 Certificate of Service)(Smith, Mallory)
September 1, 2020 E-Filing Notification: Please note for future reference that the proper event is summons returned executed. No action required RE #4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint. (TF)
August 31, 2020 RE: #4 - SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert J. Bartosiewicz. Greg Nelsen served on 8/19/2020, answer due 9/9/2020. (TF)
August 31, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Greg Nelsen on 08/19/2020, filed by Robert J. Bartosiewicz. (Johnson, Curtis)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Greg Nelsen. (CGJ)
July 17, 2020 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (CGJ)
July 17, 2020 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(CGJ)
July 17, 2020 Case assigned to Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (CGJ)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Curtis Alan Johnson on behalf of Robert J. Bartosiewicz (Johnson, Curtis)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Greg Nelsen $ 400 receipt number 0209-3905547, filed by Robert J. Bartosiewicz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Vehicle Sales Agreement, #2 Exhibit Wise Vehicle Inspection Report, #3 Exhibit Contract Selling to Bayway, #4 Exhibit Summons - Proposed, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hourihan, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bartosiewicz v. Nelsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Nelsen
Represented By: Mallory K. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert J. Bartosiewicz
Represented By: Edward P. Hourihan, Jr.
Represented By: Curtis Alan Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?