Spalding v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Derek A. Spalding
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 6:2020cv06615
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2020 Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number BUF069469. (JHF)
August 28, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Maria Pia Fragassi Santangelo on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Santangelo, Maria Pia)
August 27, 2020 Filing 4 TEXT ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff is employed, receives $2,240 in monthly income, and does not receive any government benefits. Plaintiff lives alone, does not have any dependents, and his monthly expenses are $1,040. Based on the Court's review of plaintiff's monthly income and expenses, the Court finds that plaintiff has not put forth sufficient indications of indigency, and therefore, his motion is denied. Plaintiff has until September 28, 2020 to pay the $400.00 filing fee. If plaintiff does not pay the filing fee or otherwise seek relief from this Order by September 28, 2020, the Clerk of Court will dismiss this case without prejudice without further order. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 8/27/20. (NNR)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Attached issued summons and complaint served electronically on the defendant pursuant to Western District of New York's Local Rules of Civil Procedures. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (JHF)
August 18, 2020 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (JHF)
August 18, 2020 Case placed in Social Security Assignment Pool. (JHF)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Derek A. Spalding.(Hiller, Kenneth)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Derek A. Spalding. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Hiller, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spalding v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Maria Pia Fragassi Santangelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derek A. Spalding
Represented By: Kenneth R. Hiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?