Walden v. Wolcott
Petitioner: John Walden
Respondent: Julie Wolcott
Case Number: 6:2020cv06679
Filed: September 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Frank P Geraci
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2020 Case opened in Southern District of New York as case 1:20-cv-08841, filed 10/22/2020. (JLV)
October 22, 2020 Case transferred to District of Southern District of New York. Civil case terminated. (JLV)
October 21, 2020 Filing 8 Letter Request from John Walden, dated 10/19/2020. (BK)
October 21, 2020 Filing 7 DECISION AND ORDER denying #6 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 10/21/20. Order and NEF mailed to pro se Plaintiff. (BJJ)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-Clerk shall transfer case.
October 14, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Reconsideration by John Walden. (BK)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 10/2/2020. Venue is improper here, this Court finds that the case should be transferred to the Southern District of New York, a district in which the case could have been brought, in the interest of justice. A copy of this order has been mailed to the Petitioner at Orleans Correctional. (BK)
September 28, 2020 Filing fee: $5.00, receipt number BUF069688. (BK)
September 16, 2020 Filing 4 JUDGMENT signed by Mary C. Loewenguth, Clerk of Court on 9/16/2020. A copy of this judgment has been mailed to the Petitioner at Orleans Correctional. (BK)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 9/15/2020. This action is administratively terminated. If Petitioner wishes to re-open this action, he shall so notify this Court, in writing, no later than thirty days from the date of this Order; Petitioner's writing shall include either (1) a motion to proceed in forma pauperis that includes an affidavit or affirmation establishing his inability to pay fees and costs, or (2) the $5.00 filing fee. A copy of this order has been mailed to the Petitioner at Orleans Correctional along with a blank IFP form motion. (BK)
September 3, 2020 The Pro Se Packet including: the Privacy Notice, Consent to Proceed before a Magistrate Judge and the Civil Case Timeline have been mailed to the Plaintiff. (BK)
September 3, 2020 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (BK)
September 3, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by John Walden. (BK)
September 3, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by John Walden. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (BK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walden v. Wolcott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: John Walden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Julie Wolcott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?