Carstairs v. University of Rochester
Plaintiff: Daniel Carstairs
Defendant: University of Rochester
Case Number: 6:2020cv06690
Filed: September 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Charles J Siragusa
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION AND ORDER, Answer due date updated as to University of Rochester answer due 12/4/2020. Signed by Hon. Charles J. Siragusa on 10/20/20. (KAP)
October 19, 2020 Filing 8 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by University of Rochester. (McGuirk, Richard)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Pro Hac Vice admission filed by Yvette Golan. Signed by Hon. Charles J. Siragusa on 10/08/2020. (MJK)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
October 7, 2020 Verified admission to the New York State Bar for Attorney Yvette Golan. (MD)
October 6, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to appear pro hac vice ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0209-4001319.) by Daniel Carstairs. (Attachments: #1 Oath of Office, #2 Admission by Petition, #3 ECF Registration Form, #4 Attorney's Oath Yvette Golan, #5 Sponsoring Affidavit)(Andrews, Seth)
October 2, 2020 Filing 5 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint Extending Time to Answer Complaint by University of Rochester. (McGuirk, Richard)
October 2, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard A. McGuirk on behalf of University of Rochester (McGuirk, Richard)
September 25, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Daniel Carstairs. University of Rochester served on 9/14/2020, answer due 10/5/2020. (Andrews, Seth)
September 11, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to University of Rochester. (JD)
September 11, 2020 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (JD)
September 11, 2020 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(JD)
September 11, 2020 Case Assigned to Hon. Charles J. Siragusa. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (JD)
September 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against University of Rochester $ 400 receipt number 0209-3970061, filed by Daniel Carstairs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Andrews, Seth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carstairs v. University of Rochester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Carstairs
Represented By: Seth Andrews
Represented By: Yvette Golan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Rochester
Represented By: Richard A. McGuirk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?