Bausch & Lomb Incorporated et al v. InScience Solutions LLC
Plaintiff: Bausch & Lomb Incorporated and PF Consumer Healthcare 1 LLC
Defendant: InScience Solutions LLC
Case Number: 6:2021cv06140
Filed: February 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Charles J Siragusa
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer InScience Solutions LLC answer due 4/22/2021.. Signed by Hon. Charles J. Siragusa on 4/9/21. (KAP)
April 8, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by InScience Solutions LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Fluskey, Robert)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer InScience Solutions LLC. Answer due 4/8/2021.. Signed by Hon. Charles J. Siragusa on 3/26/21. (KAP)
March 25, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by InScience Solutions LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fluskey, Robert)
March 25, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J. Fluskey, Jr on behalf of InScience Solutions LLC (Fluskey, Robert)
February 10, 2021 Filing 8 Report on the Filing or Determination of Patent or Trademark Case sent to USPTO. (Attachments: #1 Complaint)(JD)
February 10, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to InScience Solutions LLC. (JD)
February 10, 2021 Filing 6 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS to #1 Complaint, Revised Coversheet. (Myers, Laura)
February 10, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. Wolford on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Wolford, Michael)
February 10, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura A. Myers on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Myers, Laura)
February 10, 2021 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(JD)
February 10, 2021 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (JD)
February 10, 2021 Case Assigned to Hon. Charles J. Siragusa. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (JD)
February 9, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PF Consumer Healthcare 1 LLC identifying Corporate Parent GlaxoSmithKline Consumer Healthcare Holdings (No. 2) Limited, Corporate Parent PF Consumer Healthcare Holdings LLC, Corporate Parent GlaxoSmithKline Consumer Healthcare Holdings Limited, Corporate Parent Pfizer Inc., Corporate Parent Glaxosmithkline PLC for PF Consumer Healthcare 1 LLC.. (Wolford, Michael)
February 9, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bausch & Lomb Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Bausch Health Americas, Inc., Corporate Parent V-BAC Holding Corp., Corporate Parent Bausch Health Companies Inc., Corporate Parent Bausch + Lomb OPS B.V. for.. (Wolford, Michael)
February 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants $ 402 receipt number 0209-4144994, filed by Bausch & Lomb Incorporated, PF Consumer Healthcare 1 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons)(Wolford, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bausch & Lomb Incorporated et al v. InScience Solutions LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: InScience Solutions LLC
Represented By: Robert J. Fluskey, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bausch & Lomb Incorporated
Represented By: Michael R. Wolford
Represented By: Laura A. Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PF Consumer Healthcare 1 LLC
Represented By: Michael R. Wolford
Represented By: Laura A. Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?