Kruly v. Akoustis Technologies, Inc.
Plaintiff: Marlene A. Kruly
Defendant: Akoustis Technologies, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2021cv06181
Filed: February 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Frank P Geraci
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Marlene A. Kruly. (Hartt, James)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Marlene A. Kruly. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Marlene A. Kruly, #2 Exhibit B - Dr. Bernold Medical Statement, #3 Exhibit C - U of R Radiation Oncology Medical Statement)(Hartt, James)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Notice of Substitution of Counsel: David I. Klass is substituted for Seth Kaufman. CLERK TO FOLLOW UP (Klass, David)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT SCHEDULING ORDER: On 3/18/2021, Defendant filed a #5 Motion to Dismiss and a #6 Motion to Change Venue. Plaintiff's response is due by 4/19/2021, and Defendant may file a reply within 15 days after Plaintiff's response is filed. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 3/19/2021. (JEH)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to Change Venue by Akoustis Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support DEFENDANTS MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Defendant's Memorandum of Law - Declaration of H. Johnson, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A to H. Johnson Declaration - Offer Letter, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B to Defendant's Memorandum of Law - NYSDHR's Complaint)(Kaufman, Seth)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Akoustis Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support DEFENDANTS MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO DISMISS)(Kaufman, Seth)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Akoustis Technologies, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Akoustis, Inc. for Akoustis Technologies, Inc... (Kaufman, Seth)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marlene A. Kruly. Akoustis Technologies, Inc. served on 2/25/2021, answer due 3/18/2021. (Hartt, James)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Akoustis Technologies, Inc. (JD)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (JD)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(JD)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (JD)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT Marlene A. Kruly against Akoustis Technologies, Inc. $ 402 receipt number 0209-4159159, filed by Marlene A. Kruly. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons on Akoustis Technologies Inc., #3 Exhibit A - NYSDHR Determination, #4 Exhibit B - US EEOC Right to Sue)(Hartt, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kruly v. Akoustis Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlene A. Kruly
Represented By: James D. Hartt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Akoustis Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Seth Diamant Kaufman
Represented By: David I. Klass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?