Bowman et al v. Pathfinder Solutions, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Charles Bowman and Rachael Bowman
Defendant: Pathfinder Solutions, LLC, Mark Lincoln, Sam Doe(s) and John Does(s)
Case Number: 6:2021cv06366
Filed: May 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Charles J Siragusa
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Hon. Charles J. Siragusa on 6/24/21. (KAP)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
June 10, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION SCHEDULING ORDER re #4 Order, Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings, #6 MOTION to Set Aside Motion to Dismiss Scheduling Order filed by Rachael Bowman, Charles Bowman, #3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Mark Lincoln, Pathfinder Solutions, LLC. ORDERED, that Plaintiff's "Motion to Set Aside Motion to Dismiss Scheduling Order" (ECF No. 6) is granted, insofar as the Court will stay that Motion Scheduling Order (ECF No. 4) and hold Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 3) in abeyance pending a resolution of Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand (ECF No. 5); and it is further ORDERED, that with regard to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand (ECF No. 5), Defendants shall file and serve any responsive papers on or before July 12, 2021; Plaintiffs may file and serve any reply on or before August 2, 2021; and, unless it later issues a separate order scheduling oral argument, the Court will not hear oral argument, but instead, will issue a written decision at its earliest opportunity. Signed by Hon. Charles J. Siragusa on 6/10/21. (KAP)
June 10, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court . Responses due by 7/12/2021. Replies due by 8/2/2021. (KAP)
June 4, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Set Aside Motion to Dismiss Scheduling Order by Charles Bowman, Rachael Bowman.(McNamara, Jacob)
June 4, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Charles Bowman, Rachael Bowman. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Attorney Declaration, #3 Memorandum in Support, #4 Certificate of Service)(McNamara, Jacob)
May 18, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION SCHEDULING ORDER re #3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Mark Lincoln, Pathfinder Solutions, LLC, ( Responses due by 6/24/2021., Replies due by 7/16/2021.). Signed by Hon. Charles J. Siragusa on 5/18/21. (KAP)
May 12, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss by Mark Lincoln, Pathfinder Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support, #2 Certificate of Service)(Alderdice, Jacob)
May 6, 2021 Case assigned to Hon. Charles J. Siragusa. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (CGJ)
May 6, 2021 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(CGJ)
May 6, 2021 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (CGJ)
May 5, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to appear pro hac vice of Zachary C. Schauf ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0209-4238011.) by Mark Lincoln, Pathfinder Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Admission Petition Form, #2 Exhibit 2 - Admission Sponsor Affidavit, #3 Exhibit 3 - Attorneys Oath, #4 Exhibit 4 - Civility Principles and Guidelines Oath, #5 Exhibit 5 - Attorney Database and Electronic Case Filing Registration Form)(Alderdice, Jacob)
May 5, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Mark Lincoln, Pathfinder Solutions, LLC from Seneca County Supreme Court, case number 20210083. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0209-4237906), filed by Mark Lincoln, Pathfinder Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Certificate of Service)(Alderdice, Jacob)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowman et al v. Pathfinder Solutions, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pathfinder Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Jacob D. Alderdice
Represented By: Zachary C. Schauf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Lincoln
Represented By: Jacob D. Alderdice
Represented By: Zachary C. Schauf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Doe(s)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does(s)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Bowman
Represented By: Jacob P. McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachael Bowman
Represented By: Jacob P. McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?