Roberto v. County of Erie et al
Plaintiff: Charles Roberto
Defendant: County of Erie and Sheriff Deputy Mr. Imhoff
Case Number: 6:2021cv06538
Filed: August 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Frank P Geraci
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2021 Filing fee received: $402.00, receipt number BUF073496. (JHF)
September 9, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Change of Address by Charles Roberto. Plaintiff's address changed to: Charles Roberto, 21-B-1206, ATTICA CORRECTIONAL FACILITY, Box 149, Attica, NY 14011. (JHF)
August 25, 2021 Filing 3 JUDGMENT administratively terminating this action. Signed by Clerk on 8/25/21. (JHF)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER administratively terminating this action. With a copy of this order, Clerk directed to send Plaintiff a form motion to proceed in forma pauperis with supporting affirmation. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 8/25/21. (JHF)
August 25, 2021 Clerk mailed copy of #2 order, #3 judgment and a form motion to proceed in forma pauperis with supporting affirmation to pro se plaintiff. (JHF)
August 18, 2021 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (LMD)
August 18, 2021 Prisoner Pro Se Packet consisting of Privacy Notice, Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge and Civil Case Timeline mailed to plaintiff. (LMD)
August 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against County of Erie, Mr. Imhoff filed by Charles Roberto. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Letter)(LMD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roberto v. County of Erie et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Roberto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Erie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Deputy Mr. Imhoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?