Thomas v. New York State Office For People With Developmental Disabilities
Plaintiff: Stephanie E Thomas
Defendant: New York State Office For People With Developmental Disabilities
Case Number: 6:2021cv06577
Filed: September 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Frank P Geraci
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time to answer complaint. Answer or to make a motion lieu of answer is extended to 11/22/2021. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 10/22/2021. (LMD)
October 21, 2021 Filing 5 STIPULATION (Stipulation Extending Time to Answer Complaint) by New York State Office For People With Developmental Disabilities. (Halliyadde, Muditha)
October 20, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Muditha Halliyadde on behalf of New York State Office For People With Developmental Disabilities (Halliyadde, Muditha)
October 19, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stephanie E Thomas. New York State Office For People With Developmental Disabilities served on 9/16/2021, answer due 10/7/2021. (Hartt, James)
September 14, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to New York State Office For People With Developmental Disabilities. (TMK)
September 14, 2021 Case Assigned to Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (TMK)
September 14, 2021 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(TMK)
September 14, 2021 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (TMK)
September 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Stephanie E. Thomas against New York State Office For People With Developmental Disabilities $ 402 receipt number 0209-4357385, filed by Stephanie E Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A -NYSDHR Determination of Probable Cause, #3 Exhibit B - US EEOC Right to Sue, #4 Proposed Summons)(Hartt, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. New York State Office For People With Developmental Disabilities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie E Thomas
Represented By: James D. Hartt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York State Office For People With Developmental Disabilities
Represented By: Muditha Halliyadde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?