Jones v. Jackie
Plaintiff: Daniel Jones
Defendant: Nurse Jackie and Jane Doe
Case Number: 6:2021cv06597
Filed: September 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Charles J Siragusa
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2021 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:21-cv-07366.
September 22, 2021 Remark: Plaintiff has been mailed a pro se packet including a privacy notice, consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge, and a civil case timeline. (CGJ)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TRANSFER ORDER: The Clerk of Court is directed to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Western District of New York. The Clerk of Court is further directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. Whether Plaintiff should be permitted to proceed further without prepayment of fees is a determination to be made by the transferee court. A summons shall not issue from this Court. This order closes the case in the Southern District of New York. The Court certifies, under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 9/15/21) (rdz) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing. [Transferred from nysd on 9/22/2021.]
September 15, 2021 Mailed a copy of #3 Order to Daniel Jones, 16-B-3768 at Sing Sing Correctional Facility, 354 Hunter Street, Ossinning, NY 10562. (kh) [Transferred from nysd on 9/22/2021.]
September 7, 2021 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (vba) [Transferred from nysd on 9/22/2021.]
August 25, 2021 Filing 2 PRISONER AUTHORIZATION. Document filed by Daniel Jones..(rdz) [Transferred from nysd on 9/22/2021.]
August 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jackie. Document filed by Daniel Jones.(rdz) Modified on 9/1/2021 (rdz). [Transferred from nysd on 9/22/2021.]
August 25, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (rdz) [Transferred from nysd on 9/22/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Jackie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Jackie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?