Stokes, Jr. v. Wayne County et al
Plaintiff: Richie A. Stokes, Jr.
Defendant: Wayne County, Wayne County Sheriff's Office, Deputy Thomas D'Amato, Deputy Schribner, John Does #1-10, Wayne County District Attorney and John Does Wayne County District Attorney #1-10
Case Number: 6:2021cv06657
Filed: October 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Marian W Payson
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Wolford
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2021 NOTICE OF RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 2/1/2022 at 9:45 AM before Hon. Marian W. Payson. Dial-in instructions are provided in the Notice. Letter, Notice of Rule 16 Scheduling Conference, Consent Form, Privacy Notice, and Draft Scheduling Order sent by First Class Mail to the parties on 12/14/2021. (KAH)
November 19, 2021 Filing 7 TEXT ORDER directing Clerk to deny #5 Plaintiff's Request for Clerk's Entry of Default. Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 55(a) provides that when "a party against whom a judgment for affirmative relief is sought has failed to plead or otherwise defend, and that failure is shown by affidavit or otherwise, the clerk must enter the party's default." Defendants have filed an answer to Plaintiff's complaint. (Dkt. 4). Therefore, default is not warranted pursuant to Rule 55(a). SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 11/19/2021. (DJP)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
November 19, 2021 Filing 6 TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Hon. Marian W. Payson for all pretrial matters excluding dispositive motions. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 11/19/2021. (Clerk mailed a copy of this Text Order to pro se Plaintiff, Ritchie A. Stokes.) (LMD)
November 19, 2021 Clerk's Default Denied and Not Entered. Plaintiff notified per Text Order 7 and copy of this entry mailed to Plaintiff. (LMD)
November 18, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST for Clerk's Entry of Default by Richie A. Stokes, Jr. against All Defendants with proposed order and certificate of service. (LMD)
November 18, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Thomas D'Amato, John Does #1-10, John Does Wayne County District Attorney #1-10, Schribner, Wayne County, Wayne County District Attorney, Wayne County Sheriff's Office. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Naylon, Patrick)
November 18, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick B. Naylon on behalf of All Defendants (Naylon, Patrick)
October 28, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richie A. Stokes, Jr.. Wayne County att office served on 10/27/2021, answer due 11/17/2021; Wayne County Sheriff's Office served on 10/27/2021, answer due 11/17/2021. (LMD)
October 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Thomas D'Amato, John Does #1-10, John Does Wayne County District Attorney #1-10, Schribner, Wayne County, Wayne County District Attorney, Wayne County Sheriff's Office, filed by Richie A. Stokes, Jr. (LMD)
October 26, 2021 Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number ROC13155 (LMD)
October 26, 2021 Summons Issued as to Thomas D'Amato, Schribner, Wayne County, Wayne County District Attorney, Wayne County Sheriff's Office. (LMD)
October 26, 2021 Pro Se Packet consisting of Privacy Notice, Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge and Civil Case Timeline provided to plaintiff over the counter. (LMD)
October 26, 2021 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (LMD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stokes, Jr. v. Wayne County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richie A. Stokes, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne County
Represented By: Patrick B. Naylon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne County Sheriff's Office
Represented By: Patrick B. Naylon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Thomas D'Amato
Represented By: Patrick B. Naylon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Schribner
Represented By: Patrick B. Naylon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does #1-10
Represented By: Patrick B. Naylon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne County District Attorney
Represented By: Patrick B. Naylon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does Wayne County District Attorney #1-10
Represented By: Patrick B. Naylon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?