Johnson v. Russell
Petitioner: Natalie A. Johnson
Respondent: Eileen Russell
Case Number: 6:2021cv06710
Filed: November 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Frank P Geraci
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle E. Maerov on behalf of All Defendants (Maerov, Michelle)
December 2, 2021 E-Filing Notification: #3 ORDER attached (1) Petition and modified text. Electronically served a copy of the petition together with a copy of the order to Arlene Roces and Laura Lampert. Pursuant to Order sent documents by First Class Mail to plaintiff at address of record. (RE)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and that the Respondent shall file and serve an answer with memo of law to the petition in accordance with rules 4 and 5 governing section 2254 cases in the US District Court within 90 days of the date of this order. Petitioner shall have 30 days after his receipt of respondents answer or other pleading to file a written reply. The Clerk of Court shall electronically serve a copy of the petition together with a copy of this order electronically via notice of electronic filing to Arlene Roces and Laura Lampert of the Office Office of the Attorney General, Federal Habe Unit. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 11/29/21. (RE) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/2/2021: #1 Petition) (RE).
November 19, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Natalie A. Johnson.(RE)
November 19, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Natalie A. Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(RE)
November 19, 2021 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms.Prisoner Pro Se packet consisting of Privacy Notice, Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge, and Civil Case Timeline mailed to petitioner. (RE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Natalie A. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Eileen Russell
Represented By: Michelle E. Maerov
Represented By: Arlene Roces and Laura Lampert (e-service only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?