Milton v. McClintic et al
Plaintiff: Craig R. Milton
Defendant: Elysa McClintic and William McClintic
Case Number: 6:2022cv06077
Filed: February 13, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: David G Larimer
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 DECLARATION re #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Craig R. Milton Declaration of Chad Davenport in opposition to motion to dismiss filed by Craig R. Milton. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss)(Davenport, Chad)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER re #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 MOTION to Dismiss is granted. Response to #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Elysa McClintic is due on or before 4/25/22; replies due by April 6, 2022. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. David G. Larimer on 3/16/22. (PR)
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 MOTION to Dismiss by Craig R. Milton.(Davenport, Chad)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Elysa McClintic re #4 MOTION to Dismiss (Coghlan, John)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by Elysa McClintic. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Elysa McClintic, M.D.'s Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Coghlan, John)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Craig R. Milton. Elysa McClintic served on 2/16/2022, answer due 3/9/2022; William McClintic served on 2/16/2022, answer due 3/9/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service - William McClintic)(Davenport, Chad)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Elysa McClintic, William McClintic. (CGJ)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Case assigned to Hon. David G. Larimer. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (CGJ)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(CGJ)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (CGJ)
February 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants $ 402 receipt number ANYWDC-4500963, filed by Craig R. Milton. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Davenport, Chad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Milton v. McClintic et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig R. Milton
Represented By: Chad A. Davenport
Represented By: R. Anthony Rupp, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elysa McClintic
Represented By: John P Coghlan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William McClintic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?