Besley v. LaBeau et al
Plaintiff: Jeffrey S. Besley
Defendant: Jennifer R. LaBeau and John E. Schwenkler
Case Number: 6:2022cv06292
Filed: July 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: David G Larimer
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2022 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:22-cv-04921.
July 5, 2022 Remark: Plaintiff has been mailed a pro se packet including a privacy notice, consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge, and a civil case timeline. (CGJ)
June 16, 2022 MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 4. Mailed to: Jeffrey S. Besley DIN:14B0476 P.O. Box 3600 Marcy, NY 13403-5000. (kh) [Transferred from nysd on 7/5/2022.]
June 14, 2022 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Western District of New York. (sac) [Transferred from nysd on 7/5/2022.]
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TRANSFER ORDER: The Clerk of Court is directed to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Western District of New York. Whether Plaintiff should be permitted to proceed further without prepayment of fees is a determination to be made by the transferee court. A summons shall not issue from this Court. This order closes this case. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 6/14/22) (rdz) Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing. [Transferred from nysd on 7/5/2022.]
June 14, 2022 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (vba) [Transferred from nysd on 7/5/2022.]
June 10, 2022 Filing 3 PRISONER AUTHORIZATION. Document filed by Jeffrey S. Besley. (sac) [Transferred from nysd on 7/5/2022.]
June 10, 2022 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Jennifer R. LaBeau, John E. Schwenkler. Document filed by Jeffrey S. Besley. (sac) [Transferred from nysd on 7/5/2022.]
June 10, 2022 Filing 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Jeffrey S. Besley. (sac) [Transferred from nysd on 7/5/2022.]
June 10, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (sac) [Transferred from nysd on 7/5/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Besley v. LaBeau et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey S. Besley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer R. LaBeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John E. Schwenkler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?