Vision Associates of Rochester, Inc. et al v. Hartford Fire Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Vision Associates of Rochester, Inc., Genesis Vision, Inc., Frameofchoice.com, Inc., Romco USA, Inc., His Land, LLC and Patrick Ho
Defendant: Hartford Fire Insurance Company
Case Number: 6:2022cv06329
Filed: August 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Mark W Pedersen
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Wolford
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2022 Filing 9 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Remote or Telephonically for Conference on November 16, 2022, or to move the scheduled 930 am start time until later in the day by Hartford Fire Insurance Company.(Glazer, Yale)
September 12, 2022 Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion to Adjourn scheduling conference. Scheduling conference is adjourned to 11/16/22 at 9:30 a.m. Signed by Hon. Mark W. Pedersen on 9/12/22. (KAP)
September 12, 2022 Set/Reset Hearings: Scheduling Conference set for 11/16/2022 09:30 AM in Courtroom 4, 1st Floor, 100 State Street, Rochester NY before Hon. Mark W. Pedersen. (KAP)
September 8, 2022 Filing 7 First MOTION to Adjourn Initial Scheduling Conference by Frameofchoice.com, Inc., Genesis Vision, Inc., His Land, LLC, Patrick Ho, Romco USA, Inc., Vision Associates of Rochester, Inc..(Santiago, Fernando)
August 17, 2022 E-Filing Notification: #6 RESPONSE to Discovery Request. Incorrect event used to electronically file document. For future reference, use CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT event. No action required. (RE)
August 16, 2022 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Frameofchoice.com, Inc., Genesis Vision, Inc., His Land, LLC, Patrick Ho, Romco USA, Inc., Vision Associates of Rochester, Inc..(Santiago, Fernando) Modified docket text for filing event on 8/17/2022 (RE).
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 9/21/2022 at 9:45 AM before Hon. Mark W. Pedersen. A joint proposed discovery plan is due to be filed at least 4 business days prior to the conference. The proceeding will take place by telephone. Using a landline telephone, Counsel is directed to call 877-402-9753, and enter access code 7137484 at the scheduled date and time. Signed by Hon. Mark W. Pedersen on 8/10/2022. (JB)
August 9, 2022 ATTENTION CORPORATION PLAINTIFFS/DEFENDANTS: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P.7.1(b) and/or General Order No. 157 In the Matter of Disclosure of Members, Shareholders, Partners, and Leaders of Business Organization Parties, all Corporate Disclosure Statements are to be filed within seven (7) days of this notice. (KM)
August 8, 2022 Filing 4 TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Hon. Mark W. Pedersen for all pretrial matters excluding dispositive motions. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 8/8/22. (RE)
August 8, 2022 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Hartford Fire Insurance Company.(Glazer, Yale)
August 8, 2022 ADR Plan electronically forwarded to attorneys. The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(RE)
August 8, 2022 Case Assigned to Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (TMK)
August 8, 2022 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(TMK)
August 8, 2022 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (TMK)
August 5, 2022 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hartford Fire Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. for Hartford Fire Insurance Company.. (Glazer, Yale)
August 5, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Hartford Fire Insurance Company from New York State Supreme Court, Monroe County, case number E2022-004343. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANYWDC-4644248), filed by Hartford Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Process and Pleadings Below)(Glazer, Yale)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vision Associates of Rochester, Inc. et al v. Hartford Fire Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vision Associates of Rochester, Inc.
Represented By: Fernando Santiago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Genesis Vision, Inc.
Represented By: Fernando Santiago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frameofchoice.com, Inc.
Represented By: Fernando Santiago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Romco USA, Inc.
Represented By: Fernando Santiago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: His Land, LLC
Represented By: Fernando Santiago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Ho
Represented By: Fernando Santiago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Yale H. Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?