Santos v. Jones et al
Plaintiff: Byron Santos
Defendant: Officer Jones, Sergeant D. Filighera, Sergeant Hessel, John Doe #1-25, Nurse Solomon, Jane Doe, Dep. Kelly, Lt. John Doe, ORC Parker, ORC Smith, ORC Fisher, ORC Supervisor Nue, John - Jane Doe and John Doe
Case Number: 6:2022cv06338
Filed: August 12, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth A Wolford
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Letter from Byron Santos, dated 10/3/2022, to Jennifer Faus. (LMD)
October 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Authorization with envelope (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter) (LMD)
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 LETTER MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint by Byron Santos.(LMD)
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Letter from Byron Santos, dated 9/29/2022, to Western District Court Clerk. (LMD)
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Letter from Byron Santos, dated 9/28/2022, to Western District Court Clerk. (LMD)
September 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Letter from Pro Se Litigation Unit, dated 9/27/2022, to Byron Santos in response to #11 and #12 . (LMD)
September 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Letter from Byron Santos, dated 9/21/2022, to Western District Court Clerk. (Clerk sent a copy of the docket in response.) (LMD)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Letter from Byron Santos, dated 9/20/2022, to Western District Court Clerk. (LMD)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Letter from Byron Santos, dated 9/18/2022, to Western District Court Clerk. (LMD)
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Letter from Byron Santos, dated 9/15/2022, to Western District Court Clerk (LMD)
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Letter from Byron Santos, dated 9/14/2022, to Western District Court Clerk. (LMD)
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Cleck mailed a copy of the docket sheet to Plaintiff, Byron Santos in response to his letter #10 . (LMD)
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Letter with attachments from Byron Santos, dated 9/12/2022, to Western District Court Clerk (LMD)
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Letter with attachments from Byron Santos, dated 9/9/2022, to Western District Court Clerk. (LMD)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION Miscellaneous Relief by Byron Santos. (LMD)
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION Miscellaneous Relief by Byron Santos.(RE)
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Authorization Form - see #2 Motion for Leave for to Proceed in forma pauperis) by Byron Santos. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope) (LMD)
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 JUDGMENT administratively terminating the action. Signed by Mary C. Loewenguth, Clerk of Court on 8/18/22. (RE)This was mailed to: BYRON SANTOS.
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis without prejudice. The Clerk of Court shall administratively terminate this action. The Clerk of Court is directed to send to Plaintiff a prisoner authorization form and if Plaintiff wishes to reopen this action, he shall so notify this Court, in writing, no later than 30 days from the date of this Order. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 8/18/2022. (TF)This was mailed to: Byron Santos along with an authorization form.
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Byron Santos.(LMD)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Byron Santos. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LMD)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Prisoner Pro Se Packet consisting of Privacy Notice, Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge and Civil Case Timeline mailed to plaintiff. (LMD)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (LMD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Santos v. Jones et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Byron Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant D. Filighera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Hessel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #1-25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Solomon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dep. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ORC Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ORC Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ORC Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ORC Supervisor Nue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John - Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?