Freeland v. Findlay's Tall Timbers Distribution Center, LLC
Plaintiff: Eric Freeland
Defendant: Findlay's Tall Timbers Distribution Center, LLC doing business as Ohio Logistics and Findlay's Tall Timbers Distribution Center, LLC d/b/a Ohio Logistics
Case Number: 6:2022cv06415
Filed: September 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Frank P Geraci
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STIPULATION AND ORDER, Answer due date updated as to Findlay's Tall Timbers Distribution Center, LLC answer due 12/28/2022. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 11/23/22. (RE)
November 21, 2022 ATTENTION CORPORATION PLAINTIFFS/DEFENDANTS: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P.7.1(b) and/or General Order No. 157 In the Matter of Disclosure of Members, Shareholders, Partners, and Leaders of Business Organization Parties, all Corporate Disclosure Statements are to be filed within seven (7) days of this notice. (KM)
November 14, 2022 Filing 3 STIPULATION of Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Appear by Findlay's Tall Timbers Distribution Center, LLC. (Maugans, Christopher)
October 7, 2022 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Eric Freeland. Findlay's Tall Timbers Distribution Center, LLC waiver sent on 9/29/2022, answer due 11/28/2022. (Schaffer, Brian)
September 29, 2022 Original Summons Not Submitted. (TMK)
September 29, 2022 Case Assigned to Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (TMK)
September 29, 2022 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(TMK)
September 29, 2022 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (TMK)
September 28, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Findlay's Tall Timbers Distribution Center, LLC d/b/a Ohio Logistics $ 402 receipt number ANYWDC-4685848, filed by Eric Freeland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Freeland Paystubs, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schaffer, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Freeland v. Findlay's Tall Timbers Distribution Center, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Freeland
Represented By: Brian Scott Schaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Findlay's Tall Timbers Distribution Center, LLC doing business as Ohio Logistics
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Findlay's Tall Timbers Distribution Center, LLC d/b/a Ohio Logistics
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?