Gold Star Feed and Grain, LLC v. Roll-N-View Farms, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Gold Star Feed and Grain, LLC
Defendant: Roll-N-View Farms, LLC, Barton, Kiefer & Associates, LLC, Evan Barton and Nicholas Schmelzer
Case Number: 6:2022cv06537
Filed: December 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Mark W Pedersen
Referring Judge: Charles J Siragusa
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2023 Filing 24 MOTION to appear pro hac vice ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number ANYWDC-4781387.) by Gold Star Feed and Grain, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Motion for Admission, #2 Petition of Vicki Buter, #3 Sponsoring Affidavit, #4 Attorney's Oath, #5 Oath of Office, #6 Attorney Database & ECF Registration)(Jaffe, Robert)
January 23, 2023 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael E. Ferdman on behalf of Roll-N-View Farms, LLC (Ferdman, Michael)
January 23, 2023 Filing 22 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Gold Star Feed and Grain, LLC by Roll-N-View Farms, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(DiCesare, Nicholas)
January 17, 2023 ATTENTION ALL PARTIES OR INTERVENORS: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 and/ or General Order No. 157. In the Matter of Disclosure of Members, Shareholders, Partners, and Leaders of Business Organization Parties, all Corporate Disclosure Statements are to be filed with the first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (KM)
January 11, 2023 Filing 21 RULE 16 ORDER ( Scheduling Conference set for 2/15/2023 11:15 AM in US Courthouse, 100 State Street, Rochester NY 14614 before Hon. Mark W. Pedersen.). Proposed discovery plans are due to the Court at least four business days prior to the conference. Signed by Hon. Mark W. Pedersen on 1/11/23. (Attachments: t Magistrate Consent)(KAP)
January 10, 2023 Filing 20 TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Hon. Mark W. Pedersen. The Magistrate Judge is hereby designated to act in this case as follows: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), all pre-trial matters in this case are referred to the above-named United States Magistrate Judge, including but not limited to: (1) conduct of a scheduling conference and entry of a scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, (2) hearing and disposition of all non-dispositive motions or applications, (3) supervision of discovery, and (4) supervision of all procedural matters involving the aforementioned or involving the preparation of the case or any matter therein for consideration by the District Judge. All non-dispositive motions or applications shall be filed with the Clerk and made returnable before the Magistrate Judge. The parties are encouraged to consider the provisions of 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) governing consent to either partial or complete disposition of the case, including trial if necessary, by the Magistrate Judge. Consent forms are available from the office of the Magistrate Judge or the office of the Clerk of Court. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Charles J. Siragusa on 1/10/2023. (KJA)
January 9, 2023 Filing 19 MOTION to appear pro hac vice ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number ANYWDC-4765309.) by Evan Barton, Barton, Kiefer & Associates, LLC, Nicholas Schmelzer. (Attachments: #1 Motion to Admit, #2 Petition of Brian Johnson, #3 Affidavit of Sponsor, #4 Attorney Oath, #5 Civility Oath (signature page), #6 Attorney Database/ECF Registration)(Bauer, William)
January 9, 2023 Filing 18 MOTION to appear pro hac vice ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number ANYWDC-4765297.) by Evan Barton, Barton, Kiefer & Associates, LLC, Nicholas Schmelzer. (Attachments: #1 Motion for Admission, #2 Petition of Ryan Spitzer, #3 Affidavit of Sponsor, #4 Attorney Oath, #5 Civility Oath (signature page), #6 Attorney Database/ECF Registration)(Bauer, William)
January 9, 2023 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Evan Barton, Barton, Kiefer & Associates, LLC, Nicholas Schmelzer.(Bauer, William)
January 9, 2023 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gold Star Feed and Grain, LLC. Nicholas Schmelzer served on 1/3/2023, answer due 1/24/2023. (Jaffe, Robert)
January 9, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by William G. Bauer on behalf of Evan Barton, Barton, Kiefer & Associates, LLC, Nicholas Schmelzer (Bauer, William)
December 29, 2022 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gold Star Feed and Grain, LLC. Roll-N-View Farms, LLC served on 12/27/2022, answer due 1/17/2023. (Jaffe, Robert)
December 27, 2022 Filing 13 Summons Reissued as to Nicholas Schmelzer. (JHF)
December 23, 2022 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gold Star Feed and Grain, LLC. Barton, Kiefer & Associates, LLC served on 12/19/2022, answer due 1/9/2023. (Jaffe, Robert)
December 23, 2022 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gold Star Feed and Grain, LLC. Evan Barton served on 12/20/2022, answer due 1/10/2023. (Jaffe, Robert)
December 22, 2022 Filing 10 Original Summons Filed. (Jaffe, Robert)
December 16, 2022 Filing 9 Summons Reissued as to Roll-N-View Farms, LLC. (LMD)
December 15, 2022 Filing 8 Original Summons Filed. (Jaffe, Robert)
December 12, 2022 ATTENTION ALL PARTIES OR INTERVENORS: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 and/ or General Order No. 157. In the Matter of Disclosure of Members, Shareholders, Partners, and Leaders of Business Organization Parties, all Corporate Disclosure Statements are to be filed with the first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (KM)
December 8, 2022 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Nicholas Schmelzer. (LMD)
December 7, 2022 Filing 6 Original Summons Filed. (Jaffe, Robert)
December 7, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Evan Barton, Barton, Kiefer & Associates, LLC, Roll-N-View Farms, LLC. (LMD)
December 6, 2022 Filing 4 Original Summons Filed. (Jaffe, Robert)
December 6, 2022 Filing 3 Original Summons Filed. (Jaffe, Robert)
December 6, 2022 Filing 2 Original Summons Filed. (Jaffe, Robert)
December 5, 2022 Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (JLV)
December 5, 2022 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (JLV)
December 5, 2022 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution. (JLV)
December 5, 2022 Original summonses not submitted. (JLV)
December 2, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants $ 402 receipt number ANYWDC-4739086, filed by Gold Star Feed and Grain, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Jaffe, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gold Star Feed and Grain, LLC v. Roll-N-View Farms, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gold Star Feed and Grain, LLC
Represented By: Robert A. Jaffe
Represented By: Victoria H. Buter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roll-N-View Farms, LLC
Represented By: Nicholas John DiCesare
Represented By: Michael E. Ferdman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barton, Kiefer & Associates, LLC
Represented By: Ryan C Spitzer
Represented By: Brian T Johnson
Represented By: William G. Bauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evan Barton
Represented By: William G. Bauer
Represented By: Ryan C Spitzer
Represented By: Brian T Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Schmelzer
Represented By: Brian T Johnson
Represented By: Ryan C Spitzer
Represented By: William G. Bauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?