Glidedowan, LLC v. Hiscox, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Glidedowan, LLC doing business as All-American Home Care
Defendant: Hiscox, Inc., Lloyds Syndicate 3624, NGM Insurance Company and Main Street America Group
Case Number: 6:2022cv06540
Filed: December 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Frank P Geraci
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER: The Court's prior briefing schedule related to #9 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Hiscox, Inc., Lloyds Syndicate 3624, which is docketed at ECF No. 12, is hereby VACATED. Instead, non-moving parties have until 2/13/2023 to respond to both #9 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE and #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Hiscox, Inc., Lloyds Syndicate 3624. The moving defendants have until 2/27/2023 to file a reply. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 1/12/2023. (MFM)
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Support re #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Hiscox, Inc., Lloyds Syndicate 3624. (Meer, Jonathan)
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Hiscox, Inc., Lloyds Syndicate 3624.(Meer, Jonathan)
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Ellis Meer on behalf of Hiscox, Inc., Lloyds Syndicate 3624 (Meer, Jonathan)
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 VACATED** TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff and the removing defendants shall respond to #9 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Hiscox, Inc., Lloyds Syndicate 3624 by January 31, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 1/10/2023. (MFM) Modified on 1/12/2023 pursuant to Text Order 16 (RE).
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER adopting #8 Stipulation. Defendants HISCOX, INC. and LLOYDS SYNDICATE 3624 may answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's second amended complaint by January 11, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 1/10/2023. (MFM)
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order E-Filing Notification: Notice of Appearance is required pursuant to Local Rule 83.2(b) re: #8 STIPULATION and #9 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Hiscox, Inc. (RE)
January 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 REPLY/RESPONSE to re #7 Order to Show Cause, filed by Main Street America Group, NGM Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Corporate Documents, #2 Exhibit B - Email from Plaintiff's Counsel, #3 Exhibit C - Web Page)(Gerber, Daniel)
January 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Hiscox, Inc., Lloyds Syndicate 3624. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Glidedowan Report, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Thomas Hanna Report, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Marco Altieri Report, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Hiscox's Citizenship)(Meer, Jonathan)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION re #1 Notice of Removal,, extending time to respond by Hiscox, Inc., Lloyds Syndicate 3624. (Meer, Jonathan)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: The Court is unable to determine whether there is complete diversity because it cannot discern the citizenship of Plaintiff. Accordingly, Defendants are hereby Ordered to Show Cause in writing by January 9, 2023, why this case should not be remanded for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 12/12/2022. (BJJ) Modified on 12/12/2022 to indicate that NEF and Order mailed to Plaintiff's attorney. (BJJ).
December 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NGM Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Main Street America Group, Inc. for NGM Insurance Company.. (Gerber, Daniel)
December 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Main Street America Group identifying Corporate Parent AMFAM Incorporated for Main Street America Group.. (Gerber, Daniel)
December 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Main Street America Group, NGM Insurance Company.(Gerber, Daniel)
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order E-Filing Notification: #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL plaintiff's attorney to properly file a notice of change of address (or other change) on the docket pursuant to Administrative Procedures Guide for Electronic Filing. (RE)
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (RE)
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Notification of on-line civil case opening and all NEFs mailed to Plaintiff's attorney on 12/6/22. (RE)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(SG)
December 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS to #1 Notice of Removal,, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B-5 - State Court Documents (5 of 9), #2 Exhibit B-6 - State Court Documents (6 ol 9), #3 Exhibit B-7 - State Court Documents (7 of 9), #4 Exhibit B-8 - State Court Documents (8 of 9), #5 Exhibit B-9 - State Court Documents (9 of 9))(Gerber, Daniel)
December 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by NGM Insurance Company, Main Street America Group from New York State Supreme Court, County of Monroe, case number E2020002577. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANYWDC-4739188), filed by NGM Insurance Company, Main Street America Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Index of State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B-1 - State Court Documents (1 of 9), #3 Exhibit B-2 - State Court Documents (2 of 9), #4 Exhibit B-3 - State Court Documents (3 of 9), #5 Exhibit B-4 - State Court Documents (4 of 9), #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Certificate of Service)(Gerber, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glidedowan, LLC v. Hiscox, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glidedowan, LLC doing business as All-American Home Care
Represented By: Sean T. Hanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hiscox, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan Ellis Meer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lloyds Syndicate 3624
Represented By: Jonathan Ellis Meer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NGM Insurance Company
Represented By: Daniel W. Gerber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Main Street America Group
Represented By: Daniel W. Gerber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?